Moon v. Macke et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Moon and Darnell W. Moon
Defendant: Daniel Macke, Kim Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Lynn Lyons, Ned Boyd, Patrick James, Unknown US Probation Officers, Clint Unknown, Sergeant Goggins, Gary Stolzer, Jason Schott, Andy Johnson, Andrew Har, Kim S. Bramlett, Clint Vestal and Sargeant Goggins
Case Number: 4:2023cv01563
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip Delaney Stelzer for Defendants Sargeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Stelzer, Phillip)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Ned Boyd, Kim S. Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, and Daniel Macke's answers due 2/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 1/5/24. (SGP)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Response to Plaintiff's Complaint ;Proposed extension date February 22, 2024 by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim S. Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, Daniel Macke. (Schute, Karin)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Sargeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This case is before the undersigned pursuant to Local Rule 2.08(A) of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Missouri. Pending is a motion to dismiss, which the Court cannot rule on without the full, written consent of the parties. Consequently, no later than January 8, 2024, each party must complete the electronic Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating that they either consent to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge or opt to have the case assigned to a randomly-selected U.S. District Judge. Instructions for completing the required notice can be found on the Courts website at:http://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/documents/forms/moed-0041.pdf.SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 12/27/2023. (KEK)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their memorandum in support of their Motion to Dismiss within 3 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Motion to Dismiss #8 (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. Response due by 1/10/24. Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation re Response to Motion to Dismiss #7 is GRANTED in part. Response shall not exceed 30 pages. If additional pages are required, Plaintiff shall file a (second) motion for leave to file a brief in excess of page limitations and shall attach his proposed oversized brief to the motion. Finally, Plaintiff's PRO SE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REBUTTAL SCOPE OF EMPLOYMENT DETERMINATION MOTION #10 (Doc. #14 ) is GRANTED. Response to that motion is due by 1/25/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 12/27/23. (SGP)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 PRO SE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REBUTTAL SCOPE OF EMPLOYMENT DETERMINATION MOTION by Plaintiff Darnell W. Moon. (KRZ)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Darnell W. Moon. (KRZ)
December 26, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Darnell W. Moon. (KRZ)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Substitute Party United States filed by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim S. Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Clint Vestal. (Schute, Karin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Party United States by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim S. Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Clint Vestal. (Schute, Karin)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Electronic Noticing from Plaintiff. Email Address will be added to the party's record. (NEP)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Sargeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Plunkert, Robert)
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Sargeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Defendants Sargeant Goggins, Andy Johnson, Jason Schott, Gary Stolzer. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Francois County, filed by Darnell Moon.(JBH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Clint Unknown Sent To: Plaintiff (JBH)
December 7, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JBH)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Karin A. Schute for Defendants Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Charles Doerge, Patrick James, Daniel Macke, Clint Unknown. (Schute, Karin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Francois County CIrcuit Court, case number 23SF-CC00193, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ned Boyd, Kim Bramlett, Patrick James, Clint Unknown, Daniel Macke, Charles Doerge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 State court file, #4 Exhibit A - Certification of Scope of Employment, #5 Notice of Filing to Plaintiff, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Schute, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Macke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell W. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Macke
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Bramlett
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Doerge
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned Boyd
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick James
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown US Probation Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Unknown
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Goggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stolzer
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Schott
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Johnson
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Har
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim S. Bramlett
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Vestal
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargeant Goggins
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Represented By: Phillip Delaney Stelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?