Edgar v. Crawford et al
Plaintiff: |
James T Edgar |
Defendant: |
Larry Crawford, Mike Kemna, Dave Dormire, Bill Galloway, Richard Martin, Tom Koch and John Janes |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv04279 |
Filed: |
November 10, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Cole |
Presiding Judge: |
William A. Knox |
Presiding Judge: |
Scott O. Wright |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER that 22 the Report and Recommendation of July 14, 2009, is adopted. It is further ORDERED that to the extent plaintiff is bringing individual claims related to his typewriter, classification and August 2008 conduct violation, those claims ar e dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Crawford, Kemna and Dormire, brought against them in their official capacities, are dismissed based upon Eleventh Amendment immunity. It is further ORDERED that 14 defendants' motion of March 9, 2009, is granted and plaintiff's claims are dismissed. It is further ORDERED that 30 plaintiff's motion of September 28, 2009, to supplement his complaint is denied. Signed by District Judge Scott O. Wright on 11/16/2009. (Sandridge, Susan)
|
July 14, 2009 |
Filing
22
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 1 Complaint filed by James T. Edgar be dismissed; 14 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Richard Martin, Dave Dormire, Tom Koch, Mike Kemna, Larry Crawford, John Janes, Bill Galloway be granted and individual claims rel ated to the typewriter, classification and August 2008 conduct violation, be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; and claims against defendants Crawford, Kemna and Dormire, brought against them in their official capacities, be dismissed based upon Eleventh Amendment immunity. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 7/14/2009. (skb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?