October 6, 2010 |
Filing
140
ORDER Regarding Stipulated Injunction. Signed on 10/4/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
117
Order of Dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against defendants Ferrellgas, Inc., Ferrellgas LP, and Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. Signed on 8/25/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-0046 5-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
102
AMENDED ORDER granting (113 in 4:09-md-02086-GAF) MOTION for order for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Settlement filed by Steve Huffman, J. Allen Downs, Laora Fishman, Yisroel Lazaroff, Jack Fuller, Melissa Eskharia, Peter Yunis, Pat Mallaney, Bruce McIntyre, Sara Hook, Kevin Kennedy, Tina Mattern, Gina M Calarco, Brian Border, Christopher Nelson, Derrick Jackson, William Andrew McNeil, Joseph Vandyke, Gary Kashefska, Don Parker, Arron Michael Laurent, Brett Steven Powell, Dennis Carroll, John Sponcil, Michael D'Aloia, Daniel D. Scholtec, Marino Guzman, John Rustay, David Goldman, Bart Fraenkel, David Judd, Jacob Knopke, Jeremy Drucker, Mark Rodgers, Bill Mattern, Serge Traylor, Jason Brownstein with hearing to be held on 10/1/2 010 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) Signed on 5/19/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
101
ORDER in case 4:09-cv-00465-GAF; granting (113) motion for Preliminary Approval of amended Class Settlement in case 4:09-md-02086-GAF Signed on 5/19/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv- 00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing
91
ORDER ESTABLISHING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL. Signed on 4/14/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying in case 4:09-cv-00465-GAF; denying (56) motion for Judicial Notice of Facts Germane to Determination of Whether to Grant Preliminary Approval to the Proposed Amerigas Settlement. in case 4:09-md-02086-GAF Signed on 3/11/10 by District J udge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing
35
ORDER Appointing Interim Class Counsel. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 12/11/09. Associated Cases: 4:09-md-02086-GAF, 2:09-cv-04176-GAF, 4:09-cv-00465-GAF, 4:09-cv-00841-GAF, 4:09-cv-00842-GAF, 4:09-cv-00843-GAF, 4:09-cv-00844-GAF, 4:09-cv-00917-GAF, 4:09-cv-00918-GAF, 4:09-cv-00919-GAF, 4:09-cv-00920-GAF, 4:09-cv-00922-GAF, 4:09-cv-00923-GAF, 4:09-cv-00924-GAF, 4:09-cv-00925-GAF, 4:09-cv-00926-GAF, 4:09-cv-00927-GAF, 4:09-cv-00928-GAF, 4:09-cv-00929-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa)
|