Janson et al v. LegalZoom.com, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that legal documents provided by Defendant LegalZoom constituted the unauthorized practice of law.

Resources:

Plaintiff: Todd Janson, Gerald T. Ardrey, Chad M Ferrell and C & J Remodeling LLC
Defendant: LegalZoom.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv04018
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 201 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey denying as moot documents: 86 , 146 , 147 , 148 , 149 , 150 , 151 , 152 , 153 , 154 , 155 , 156 , 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 , 161 , 162 , 163 , 164 , 166 , and 196 . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
November 14, 2011 200 Featured Case PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER. Signed on 11/14/2011 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 28, 2011 199 SUGGESTIONS in support re 197 MOTION for order Approving Class Action Settlement filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 197 ) (Thompson, Robert)
September 28, 2011 198 SUGGESTIONS in support re 197 MOTION for order Approving Class Action Settlement filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 197 ) (Clement, Matthew)
September 28, 2011 197 MOTION for order Approving Class Action Settlement filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Clement, Matthew)
September 27, 2011 196 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/14/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
September 23, 2011 195 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 194 motion for extension of time to file motion for preliminary approval of settlement. The deadline is extended to Tuesday September 27, 2011. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
September 23, 2011 194 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/11/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
August 12, 2011 193 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2011. Teleconference held. The parties informed the Court that a settlement has been reached. Plaintiff will file a motion for preliminary approval of settlement by September 23, 2011. The Court struck the pretrial conference and jury trial setting based upon the parties representation that the case has settled. (Kanies, Renea)
August 9, 2011 192 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 150 MOTION in limine Regarding LegalZoom's Documents Disclosed After Discovery Deadline filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 191 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 164 MOTION in limine to Exclude Advertising Under Federal Rules of Evidence 402 and 403 filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Clement, Matthew)
August 9, 2011 190 PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 189 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 161 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that Plainitffs claims are brought to protect the legal profession filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 161 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 188 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 157 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that a computer cannot practice law filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 157 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 187 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 163 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that LegalZooms customers are satisfied and that LegalZooms products are not defective filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 163 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 186 PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 9, 2011 185 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 155 MOTION in limine Regarding Any Evidence That LegalZoom Makes Legal Documents Available for Low and Middle Income Americans filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 155 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 184 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 152 MOTION in limine Regarding Computer Software or Publications of Legal Forms filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 152 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 183 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 151 MOTION in limine Regarding Any Evidence of the Missouri Bar Failing to Discipline or Take Action Against LegalZoom filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 151 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 182 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 149 MOTION in limine Regarding History of the Regulation of the Practice of Law filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 149 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 181 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 162 MOTION in limine Motion in Limine to exclude any evidence or argument that LegalZoom does not provide legal advice to its customers filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 162 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 180 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 160 MOTION in limine To Exclude the Testimony of Any Class Members Who Have Opted Out of the Class filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 179 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 159 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument of the availability of legal forms or computer software in Missouri filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 159 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 178 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 158 MOTION in limine Regarding Statements or Declarations Made by the Federal Trade Commission filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 158 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 177 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 156 MOTION in limine to Exclude Improper Opinion Evidence from John Smallwood filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 176 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 154 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument concerning the In re Thompson decision filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 154 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 175 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 153 MOTION in limine Regarding the Attorney/Client Relationship Between the Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 174 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 148 MOTION in limine Regarding Evidence of Disclaimer and/or Waiver filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 148 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 173 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 147 MOTION in limine Regarding Evidence of No Damage to the Class filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 147 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 172 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 146 MOTION in limine Regarding LegalZoom's Business Model filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 146 ) (Wicks, James)
August 9, 2011 171 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 166 MOTION in limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Prejudgment Interest filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Reply suggestions due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 166 ) (Simeri, James)
August 5, 2011 170 OBJECTIONS (non motions) by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 140 Objections (non motion), Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Counter Designations of Deposition Testimony. Related document: 140 Objections (non motion), filed by Gerald T. Ardrey, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson, C & J Remodeling LLC.(Wicks, James)
August 5, 2011 169 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 3, 2011 168 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey: Teleconference held regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-Open Limited Discovery and Compel Production [Doc. 123]. The Court ordered the defendant to produce to plaintiff within seven days the recent advertisement with the understanding there will be no disputes about authenticity or being aired on a public media, etc. The defendant raised an issue regarding the list of opted out individuals received from Plaintiff. The Court will rule on this issue raised in a motion after the briefing is complete. (Kanies, Renea)
August 2, 2011 167 SUGGESTIONS in support re 166 MOTION in limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Prejudgment Interest filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 166 ) (Thompson, Robert)
August 2, 2011 166 MOTION in limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Prejudgment Interest filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
August 2, 2011 165 SUGGESTIONS in support re 164 MOTION in limine to Exclude Advertising Under Federal Rules of Evidence 402 and 403 filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Thompson, Robert)
August 2, 2011 164 MOTION in limine to Exclude Advertising Under Federal Rules of Evidence 402 and 403 filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
August 2, 2011 163 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that LegalZooms customers are satisfied and that LegalZooms products are not defective filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 162 MOTION in limine Motion in Limine to exclude any evidence or argument that LegalZoom does not provide legal advice to its customers filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 161 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that Plainitffs claims are brought to protect the legal profession filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 160 MOTION in limine To Exclude the Testimony of Any Class Members Who Have Opted Out of the Class filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 159 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument of the availability of legal forms or computer software in Missouri filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 158 MOTION in limine Regarding Statements or Declarations Made by the Federal Trade Commission filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 157 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument that a computer cannot practice law filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 156 MOTION in limine to Exclude Improper Opinion Evidence from John Smallwood filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 155 MOTION in limine Regarding Any Evidence That LegalZoom Makes Legal Documents Available for Low and Middle Income Americans filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 154 MOTION in limine to exclude any evidence or argument concerning the In re Thompson decision filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
August 2, 2011 153 MOTION in limine Regarding the Attorney/Client Relationship Between the Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 152 MOTION in limine Regarding Computer Software or Publications of Legal Forms filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 151 MOTION in limine Regarding Any Evidence of the Missouri Bar Failing to Discipline or Take Action Against LegalZoom filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 150 MOTION in limine Regarding LegalZoom's Documents Disclosed After Discovery Deadline filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 149 MOTION in limine Regarding History of the Regulation of the Practice of Law filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 148 MOTION in limine Regarding Evidence of Disclaimer and/or Waiver filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 147 MOTION in limine Regarding Evidence of No Damage to the Class filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 146 MOTION in limine Regarding LegalZoom's Business Model filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
August 2, 2011 145 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendant LegalZoom's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. # 100] is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' claims as they relate to patent and trademark applications and DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. # 88] is GRANTED, and the Motion to Strike [Doc. # 114] and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony [Doc. # 86] are DENIED as they relate to the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kanies, Renea)
August 2, 2011 144 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The Final Pretrial Conference is moved to 12:30 PM on 8/22/2011 in the District Courtroom, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 8/22/2011 at 01:00 PM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
August 1, 2011 143 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher C. Grenz on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc. (Grenz, Christopher)
August 1, 2011 142 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - the mediation scheduled before Magistrate Whitworth on August 11, 2011 has been cancelled as parties are going to mediate the case before an outside mediator. This is the official notice for this hearing. (Price, Jackie)
July 29, 2011 141 OBJECTIONS (non motions) by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 137 DESIGNATION Defendant's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony. Related document: 137 DESIGNATION filed by Gerald T. Ardrey, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson, C & J Remodeling LLC.(Wicks, James)
July 29, 2011 140 OBJECTIONS (non motions) by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson re 138 DESIGNATION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND PLAINTIFFS COUNTER DESIGNATIONS. Related document: 138 DESIGNATION filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Clement, Matthew)
July 28, 2011 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Defendant's Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
July 22, 2011 138 DESIGNATION Defendant's Deposition Designations by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Wicks, James)
July 22, 2011 137 DESIGNATION Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Simeri, James)
July 22, 2011 136 Settlement Conference set for 8/11/2011 at 9:00 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, Jefferson City (MW) before Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. Signed on 7/22/2011 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (Price, Jackie)
July 21, 2011 135 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/3/2011 at 10:00 AM regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery [Doc. # 123]. Plaintiffs shall intiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679.This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
July 21, 2011 134 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The Court GRANTS Defendant LegalZoom's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. # 100] with respect to Plaintiffs' claims as they relate to patent and trademark applications and DENIES it in all other respects. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. # 88] is GRANTED, and their Motion to Strike [Doc. # 114] and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony [Doc. # 86] are DENIED as they relate to the Motion for Summary Judgment. A full Order will follow. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
July 20, 2011 133 Featured Case ORDER SETTING MONDAY, AUGUST 22, 2011, TRIAL DOCKET (TWO-WEEK DOCKET).(Smith, Fran)
July 15, 2011 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Defendant's First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
July 8, 2011 131 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/8/2011. Teleconference held regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery and Compel Production [Doc. 123]. The Court discussed the issue of the parties voluntarily agreeing to submit this case directly to the Supreme Court or to the State court and work its way up. The Court gave the parties until July 13, 2011, to consider the issue and to send a joint email to Renea Kanies, Courtroom Deputy, regarding whether or not there is an agreement on the issue. The Court took the Motion to Reopen Discovery and Compel Production [Doc. 123] under advisement until after July 13, 2011. (Kanies, Renea)
July 5, 2011 130 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING TELECONFERENCE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The Telephone Conference previously set for 7/6/2011 is reset for 7/8/2011 at 09:00 AM regarding Motion to Reopen Discovery. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
July 1, 2011 129 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 7/6/2011, at 09:30 AM, before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey regarding Motion to Reopen Discovery. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Smith, Fran)
June 29, 2011 128 NOTICE to take deposition of Richard F. Waigand filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
June 27, 2011 127 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 123 MOTION for discovery to Reopen Discovery and Compel Production filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 7/14/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 123 ) (Wicks, James)
June 23, 2011 126 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE. Telephone Conference previously set for 6/28/2011, at 1:30 PM, is RESET for 04:45 PM, same day, before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Smith, Fran)
June 20, 2011 125 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. A Telephone Conference set for 6/28/2011 at 01:30 PM regarding Motion to Reopen Discovery. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
June 17, 2011 124 SUGGESTIONS in support re 123 MOTION for discovery to Reopen Discovery and Compel Production filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 123 ) (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
June 17, 2011 123 MOTION for discovery to Reopen Discovery and Compel Production filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/5/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
June 16, 2011 122 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER moving location of pretrial conference. The Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2011, at 10:00 AM, in Jefferson City, will now be held in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (NKL), before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Smith, Fran)
June 13, 2011 121 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 114 MOTION to strike 90 MOTION for summary judgment , 91 Suggestions in Support of Motion,, 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) , 101 Suggestions in Support of Motion (Sealed),, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike L filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 114 ) (Butsch, David)
May 27, 2011 120 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 114 MOTION to strike 90 MOTION for summary judgment , 91 Suggestions in Support of Motion,, 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) , 101 Suggestions in Support of Motion (Sealed),, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike L filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 6/13/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 114 ) (Thompson, Robert)
May 19, 2011 119 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 100 ) (Wicks, James)
May 19, 2011 118 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 88 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Clement, Matthew)
May 18, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 116 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Ten Pages. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
May 17, 2011 116 MOTION for leave to file excess pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Ten Pages filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
May 12, 2011 115 SUGGESTIONS in support re 114 MOTION to strike 90 MOTION for summary judgment , 91 Suggestions in Support of Motion,, 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) , 101 Suggestions in Support of Motion (Sealed),, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike L filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 114 ) (Simeri, James)
May 12, 2011 114 MOTION to strike 90 MOTION for summary judgment , 91 Suggestions in Support of Motion,, 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) , 101 Suggestions in Support of Motion (Sealed),, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike LegalZoom's Summary-Judgment Facts 45 Through 79 filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 90 , 91 , 100 , 101 ) (Simeri, James)
May 12, 2011 113 SUGGESTIONS in opposition (SEALED) re 90 MOTION for summary judgment , 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Reply suggestions due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 90 , 100 ) (Simeri, James)
May 12, 2011 112 SUGGESTIONS in opposition to motion for summary judgment (SEALED) re 88 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Thompson, Robert)
May 12, 2011 111 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting motions for leave to seal suggestions in opposition to motions for summary judgment and exhibits under seal, Doc. 107 and 109 . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
May 12, 2011 110 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 86 MOTION for order Excluding Expert Testimony filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Butsch, David)
May 11, 2011 109 MOTION for leave to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
May 11, 2011 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/11/11 as Document No. 108, Motion for Order Sealed. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Bax, Laura)
May 11, 2011 108 MOTION for Order (SEALED) Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Suggestions in Opposition to Defendent's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy) Modified on 5/11/2011. Document deleted as the incorrect event was used. The document will be refiled using the correct event (Bax, Laura).
May 11, 2011 107 MOTION to seal document Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
April 27, 2011 105 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Summary Judgment Motions. The suggestions in opposition to motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before May 12, 2011. Plaintiff is granted leave to exceed the page limit by ten pages. The reply briefs to the motions shall be filed on or before May 19, 2011. The parties shall comply with this Order when filing briefs and not the deadlines automatically calculated by ECF when filing the suggestions in opposition to the motions. No further extensions will be granted. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
April 26, 2011 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 4/8/11 as Document No. 90, 91, 92, Motion for Summary Judgment, Suggestions in Support, Notice Exhibits to SIS of SJ. The documents have been deleted and refiled under seal as Document No. 100 and 101, Motion for Summary Judgment, Suggestions in Support and Exhibit Attachments under seal. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
April 26, 2011 104 Joint MOTION for extension of time to respond to Summary Judgment Motions filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clement, Matthew)
April 25, 2011 103 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 86 MOTION for order Excluding Expert Testimony filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/12/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 86 ) (Thompson, Robert)
April 21, 2011 102 NOTICE of filing of Class Action Notice by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
April 15, 2011 101 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H-1, # 10 Exhibit H-2, # 11 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 100 ) (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 4/18/2011 to reflect that the Court received in paper form the Motion for Summary Judgment, Suggestions in Support, Exhibit Index & exhibits, and Exhibits 2 and 3 to Exhibit "H" in computer software from (Wheeler, LaTandra).
April 15, 2011 100 MOTION for summary judgment (SEALED) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/9/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Thompson, Robert)
April 14, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 98 Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment and the exhibits all under seal on ECF. Defendant shall provide a courtesy copy of the documents to the Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
April 14, 2011 98 MOTION to seal document filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
April 14, 2011 97 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 96 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Suggestions in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
April 14, 2011 96 MOTION for leave to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Suggestions in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
April 14, 2011 95 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 94 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
April 11, 2011 94 Joint MOTION for order Approving Stipulation Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of All Parties. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
April 11, 2011 93 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 88 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Van Ronzelen, Timothy) (Attachment 23 replaced on 4/21/2011) (Bax, Laura).
April 11, 2011 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/8/11 as Document No. 89, Suggestions in Support. The document and attachments have been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel will refile the correct documents. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Bax, Laura)
April 8, 2011 92 NOTICE (SEALED) by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 91 Suggestions in Support of Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibits to SIS of SJ)(Thompson, Robert) Modified on 4/26/2011 - document deleted - duplicate of 101 filed under seal(Kanies, Renea).
April 8, 2011 91 SUGGESTIONS in support re 90 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H-1, # 10 Exhibit H-2, # 11 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 4/11/2011 to reflect receipt of Exhibits 2 & 3 to H in the JC Clerk's office(Bax, Laura). Modified on 4/26/2011 - Document deleted - duplicate of 101 filed under seal. (Kanies, Renea).
April 8, 2011 90 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 4/26/2011 - Document Deleted, duplicate of 100 filed under seal. (Kanies, Renea).
April 8, 2011 89 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 88 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Van Ronzelen, Timothy) Modified on 4/11/2011 - Documents deleted and the incorrect main document was filed. The correct document and attached exhibits will be refiled by counsel (Bax, Laura).
April 8, 2011 88 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
April 8, 2011 87 SUGGESTIONS in support re 86 MOTION for order Excluding Expert Testimony filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Butsch, David)
April 8, 2011 86 MOTION for order Excluding Expert Testimony filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/25/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Butsch, David)
April 4, 2011 84 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 83 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages for suggestions in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
April 4, 2011 83 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages for suggestions in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
April 4, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and to Direct Defendant to Provide Class Contact Information [Doc. # 63] is granted in part. Notice shall be provided to class members as described therein, with the following exceptions. Plaintiff shall delete the final sentence of the notice, which currently reads: "They are not permitted to answer any questions." Furthermore, as the parties have already agreed, the website address will be changed to www.jansonclassaction.com. The revised notice shall be filed on ECF. As proposed by Plaintiffs, the deadline by which the notice must be distributed shall be 45 days from the date of this Order, and the deadline for opting out shall be 60 days from the date by which the notice must be distributed. Finally, as Defendant recognizes, the Court has wide discretion in managing the definition of the class. Considering that the evidence indicates that circumstances have not changed since class certification -- but also taking into account the practical difficulties of allowing the class to remain open as the trial date approaches -- the Court interprets the language "to the present" in the class definition as running up until the date that the class notice is distributed. Therefore, Defendant has one week from the date of this Order to produce the email and physical addresses of the remainder of the class members. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
March 15, 2011 81 SUPPLEMENT to Motion for Approval of Class Notice and to Direct LegalZoom to Provide Class Contact Information. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Clement, Matthew)
March 10, 2011 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
March 2, 2011 79 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 63 MOTION for order Order for Notice and Publication filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Clement, Matthew)
March 1, 2011 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 77 NOTICE to take deposition of Tim Bint filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 76 NOTICE to take deposition of Scott MacDonnell filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 75 NOTICE to take deposition of Nelly Jacobo filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 74 NOTICE to take deposition of Jake Varghese filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 73 NOTICE to take deposition of Frank Monestere filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 72 NOTICE to take deposition of Adam Thomas filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 18, 2011 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Discovery Reponses filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
February 16, 2011 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Expert Disclosures filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
February 14, 2011 69 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 63 MOTION for order Order for Notice and Publication filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 3/3/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 63 ) (Wicks, James)
February 4, 2011 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs for Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 3, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/4/2011 at 02:30 PM regarding discovery disputes. The parties shall email a one page summary of the dispute to Renea_Kanies@mow.uscourts.gov by 9:00 am on 2/4/2011. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference and contact the Court last at (816) 512-5679. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
February 3, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Disclosures of Expert Testimony. Defendant's disclosure of expert testimony is due on or before February 15, 2011. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
February 3, 2011 65 MOTION for extension of time to make Disclosures of Expert Testimony filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
January 31, 2011 64 SUGGESTIONS in support re 63 MOTION for order Order for Notice and Publication filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Clement, Matthew)
January 31, 2011 63 MOTION for order Order for Notice and Publication filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/17/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Clement, Matthew)
January 10, 2011 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of January 7, 2011 service of Plaintiffs' Second Interrogatories to Defendant and Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Simeri, James)
December 14, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class [Doc. # 45] is GRANTED. (Kanies, Renea)
November 12, 2010 60 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Class-Action Petition filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Wicks, James)
November 12, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 58 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Amended Class-Action Petition. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
November 2, 2010 58 MOTION to amend/correct 30 Answer to Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Amended Class-Action Petition filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/19/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Wicks, James)
October 28, 2010 57 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion (Sealed) re 45 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class filed by David T. Butsch on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Butsch, David)
October 25, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 55 motion for extension of time to file reply brief to 45 MOTION to certify class. Reply suggestions due by 10/28/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
October 22, 2010 55 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 45 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Simeri, James)
October 20, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 53 motion for leave to file excess pages. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
October 20, 2010 53 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
October 8, 2010 52 SUGGESTIONS in opposition (SEALED) re 45 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hartman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Janson Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Ferrell Deposition, # 4 Exhibit Ardrey Deposition)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Thompson, Robert)
October 7, 2010 51 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 50 defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
October 7, 2010 50 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
September 22, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Defendants' response to 45 Motion to Certify Class is due by October 8, 2010, and Plaintiffs' reply is due by October 18, 2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
September 21, 2010 48 Joint MOTION for extension of time of the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of All Parties. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/8/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
September 2, 2010 47 This case has been assigned to the University of Missouri Law School - Mediation Clinic. Professor James Levin will be contacting counsel about scheduling mediation in Columbia, Mo. Any questions should be directed to Jackie at jackie_price@mow.uscourts.gov TEXT ENTRY ONLY - no document is attached. (Price, Jackie)
August 27, 2010 46 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 45 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Simeri, James)
August 27, 2010 45 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to certify class filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/13/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Dep. of LegalZoom and dep. exs. 1 to 49, # 2 Exhibit 2, Decl. of Janson, # 3 Exhibit 3, Decl. of Ferrell, # 4 Exhibit 4, Decl. of Ardrey, # 5 Exhibit 5, Decl. of Butsch, # 6 Exhibit 6, Decl. of Van Ronzelen, # 7 Exhibit 7, Decl. of Robertson, # 8 Exhibit 8, Decl. of Barners)(Simeri, James)
August 25, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 43 motion for leave to file suggestions in support of class certification in excess of 15 pages. The plaintiffs are granted an additional 5 pages. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
August 25, 2010 43 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/13/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
July 30, 2010 42 Featured Case PROTECTIVER ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 41 motion for protective order. (Kanies, Renea)
July 29, 2010 41 MOTION for protective order Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and Agreement of Confidentiality filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/16/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
July 27, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey denying 31 Defendant Legalzoom's Motion to Reconsider or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue. (Kanies, Renea)
July 23, 2010 39 NOTICE to take deposition of LegalZoom.com, Inc. filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson.(Simeri, James)
July 23, 2010 38 NOTICE to take deposition of Plaintiffs Todd Janson, Gerald T. Ardrey and Chad M. Ferrell filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
July 14, 2010 37 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 31 MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION to change venue filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Wicks, James)
July 8, 2010 36 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 31 MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION to change venue filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Reply suggestions due by 7/26/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 31 ) (Simeri, James)
June 30, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 34 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to Doc. 31 is due on or before July 8, 2010. Defendant's reply is due on or before July 14, 2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
June 30, 2010 34 Joint MOTION for extension of time of the Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Motion to Reconsider or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of All Parties. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/19/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wicks, James)
June 16, 2010 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant and Defendant's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
June 16, 2010 32 SUGGESTIONS in support re 31 MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative MOTION to change venue filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Wicks, James)
June 16, 2010 31 MOTION for reconsideration re 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, or, in the Alternative, MOTION to change venue filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/6/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward R. Hartman, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert M. Thompson)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Wicks, James)
June 16, 2010 30 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Class-Action Petition filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
June 1, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Nanette Laughrey denying 17 motion to dismiss case. Pending before the Court is a Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc. [Doc. 17]. The Court DENIES the Motion. The Court finds that venue is proper in the Western District of Missouri where Plaintiffs reside and the defendant corporation is subject to personal jurisdiction. The Court further finds that a motion to dismiss pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406, or Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), is not the proper procedure for enforcing a forum selection clause. See 14D Charles Alan Wright, Arthur R. Miller & Edward H. Cooper, Federal Practice and Procedure § 3803.1 (3d ed. 2010). Therefore, Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc., is ordered to file its answer no later than June 16, 2010. Alternatively, no later than June 16, 2010, LegalZoom.com, Inc., may file a motion to transfer venue to the Central District of California. If LegalZoom.com, Inc., files a motion to transfer, Plaintiffs have until July 1, 2010, to file a response. LegalZoom.com, Inc., may file a reply no later than July 7, 2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Smith, Fran)
June 1, 2010 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LegalZoom.com, Inc. of Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Todd Janson, Gerald T. Ardrey, Chad M. Ferrell and C & J Remodeling LLC filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
April 19, 2010 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Wicks, James)
April 12, 2010 26 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 17 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice for Improper Venue filed by James T. Wicks on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Wicks, James)
April 5, 2010 25 Notice of EAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Price, Jackie)
March 25, 2010 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 17 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice for Improper Venue filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Reply suggestions due by 4/12/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 17 ) (Simeri, James)
March 11, 2010 23 RULES OF TRIAL entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Kanies, Renea)
March 11, 2010 22 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Class Discovery due 7/26/2010. Motion for Class Certification due by 8/27/2010. Discovery on the merits due 3/9/2011. Dispositive Motions due 4/8/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2011 at 10:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 8/22/2011 at 09:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City. (Attachments: # 1 Memo on PTC) (Kanies, Renea)
March 10, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 20 motion for extension of time to file response to 17 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice for Improper Venue. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 3/25/2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
March 10, 2010 20 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Simeri, James)
March 5, 2010 19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Joint Discovery Plan by Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson, LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
February 26, 2010 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re 17 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice for Improper Venue filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Thompson, Robert)
February 26, 2010 17 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice for Improper Venue filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/15/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward R. Hartman)(Thompson, Robert)
February 17, 2010 16 NOTICE of appearance by James T. Wicks on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc. (Wicks, James)
February 12, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s answer is due 2/26/2010. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
February 11, 2010 14 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/1/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clear, John)
February 11, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/4/2010. Rule 26 conference due by 2/25/2010. (Kanies, Renea)
February 11, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Kanies, Renea)
February 11, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney David T. Butsch for Gerald T. Ardrey,David T. Butsch for C & J Remodeling LLC,David T. Butsch for Chad M Ferrell,David T. Butsch for Todd Janson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Signed on 2/11/10 by Unassigned. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(James, Carrie)
February 9, 2010 10 Motion to allow David T. Butsch to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2283823) filed by James J. Simeri on behalf of Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson. (Simeri, James)
February 9, 2010 9 NOTICE of appearance by James J. Simeri on behalf of Gerald T. Ardrey, C & J Remodeling LLC, Chad M Ferrell, Todd Janson (Simeri, James)
February 9, 2010 8 NOTICE (SEALED) by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, 7 Order on Motion to Seal Document Declaration of Edward R. Hartman (Clear, John)
February 8, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 4 motion to seal document. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
February 5, 2010 6 NOTICE of filing by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, to State Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Supplement Acknowledgement of State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Clear, John)
February 5, 2010 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 02/05/10 as Document No. 5, SUGGESTIONS in support re 4 MOTION to seal document filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward R. Hartman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 4 ). The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in WordPerfect format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (McDowell, Shelly)
February 5, 2010 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re 4 MOTION to seal document filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward R. Hartman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Clear, John)
February 5, 2010 4 MOTION to seal document filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clear, John)
February 5, 2010 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of Defendant LegalZoom.com, Inc..(Clear, John)
February 5, 2010 2 NOTICE of filing by LegalZoom.com, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Part 3 of Exhibit 1)(Clear, John)
February 5, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cole County Circuit Court, 19th Judicial Circuit County, case number 09AC-CC-00737, filed by John Michael Clear on behalf of LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0866-2279541. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court File, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clear, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janson et al v. LegalZoom.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Janson
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald T. Ardrey
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad M Ferrell
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & J Remodeling LLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LegalZoom.com, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Clear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?