Barfield et al v. Sho-Me Power Electric Cooperative et al
Plaintiff: Chase Barfield, Michael D Biffle and Gina Biffle
Defendant: Sho-Me Power Electric Cooperative, Sho-Me Technologies, LLC, KAMO Electric Cooperative, Inc. and K-PowerNet, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv04321
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Hickory
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER and JUDGMENT entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey approving class settlement agreement and directing notice of final approval. Signed November 15, 2018 by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Signed on 11/15/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration, Doc. 890 , is DENIED. The Court reaffirms its decision to vacate the judgment as to both actual and punitive damages and to order a new trial concerning both actual and punitive damages. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Defendants' motion pursuant to Rule 50 for judgment as a matter of law, Doc. 846 . (Sreeprakash, Netra)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 59(d), the Court now vacates the judgment entered on September 5, 2017 and sua sponte orders a new trial. Signed on 9/29/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey, granting Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to reserve administrative expenses. Doc. 758 . (Barragan-Scott, Alana)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion to Require the Sho-Me Defendants to Post Adequate Security for the Judgment, 654 , is granted in part. Sho-Me's Renewed Motion to Stay Judgment Without Bond, 659 , is denied. Sho-Me's Motion to Approve a Letter of Credit as Security for a Stay of Judgment, 661 , is granted in part. Sho-Me's Motion to Approve Form of a Letter of Credit as Security for a Stay of Judgment, 691 , is denied as moot. The Parties' Joint Amended Motion to Approve the Form of a Letter of Credit and Escrow Agreement as Security for a Stay of Judgment, 715 , is granted. (Cross, Ashley)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 700 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses to Class Counsel, 556 , is granted. (Cross, Ashley)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. After consideration of all documents in Plaintiffs' status report, 539 , and the documents and statements included with the Parties' subsequent Motion, Plaintiffs' and KAMO's Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of the KAMO-KPN Class Settlement Agreement, 540 , is granted. A fairness hearing is scheduled for January 16, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom No. 4B, United States Courthouse, 80 Lafayette Street, Je fferson City, Missouri 65101. The hearing will be adjourned on January 16 and reconvened in the same Courtroom on January 23, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. so that the Court may consider any objections from KAMO Class Members filed before that date. (Cross, Ashley)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The following documents are privileged communications and protected from disclosure: KCF0013979, KCF0013986, KCF0014095, KCF0014097, KCF0014098, KCF0014101, KCF0014102, KCF0014110, KCF0014111, KFC0014118, KCF 0014119, KAMO-0038605, KAMO-0038663-66, and KAMO-0041961. The following documents are not privileged and must be produced to Plaintiffs entirely in un-redacted form: KCF0014109, KCF0014117, KAMO-0037334, KAMO-0037473, KAMO-0037562, KAMO-0037954, KAM O-0038602, KAMO-0038606, KAMO-0039422, KAMO-0039618, KAMO-0041462, KAMO-0041795-96, KAMO-0044058, and KAMO-0044816. The following documents are only privileged in part, and KAMO must produce un-redacted versions of these documents consistent with the attached Order: KAMO-0037469, KAMO-0038601, KAMO-0044053, KAMO-0044815, and KAMO-0044812. Any document ordered to be produced must be produced within three days of the date of this Order. (Cross, Ashley)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan of Notice and of Proposed Forms of Notice, [Doc. 412], is GRANTED except for specific amendments discussed within the attached Order. The Court adopts the Parties' proposed Revised Scheduling Order, [Doc. 411]. (Cross, Ashley)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Sho-Me's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to the "local controversy" and "home-state" exceptions to the Class Action Fairness Act, 376 , is DENIED. (Cross, Ashley)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The KAMO Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Chase Barfield, 229 , is GRANTED. The Sho-Me Defendants' Renewed and Restated Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Biffle and Ro bertson Plaintiffs, 239 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Defendants' Liability, 245 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The KAMO Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Liabili ty, 293 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Sho-Me Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Members of the Class Who Have Unadjudicated Claims Against the Sho-Me Defendants, 296 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Sho-Me Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against the KAMO Class Members, 297 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Sho-Me Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations, 298 , is GRANTED. The Sho-Me Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Class Members' Consent, 299 , is DENIED. Summary judgment is DENIED as to Category 1E easements. (Cross, Ashley)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 146 motion to certify class. (Matthes, Renea)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. The Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Renew filed by Defendants Sho-Me Power Electric Cooperative and Sho-Me Technologies (Sho-Me) [Docs. ## 33 and 69] are hereby DENIED in part and GRANTED in part; the two Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants KAMO Electric Cooperative (KAMO) [Docs. ## 34 and 70] are hereby DENIED; Sho-Mes Request to Take Judicial Notice [Doc. # 78]; and Motion to Change Venue [Doc. # 23] are also DENIED. (Kanies, Renea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfield et al v. Sho-Me Power Electric Cooperative et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Barfield
Represented By: Kathleen C Kauffman
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Biffle
Represented By: Kathleen C Kauffman
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Biffle
Represented By: Kathleen C Kauffman
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sho-Me Power Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Terry M Evans
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Dana L. Kollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sho-Me Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Terry M Evans
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Dana L. Kollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMO Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-PowerNet, LLC
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?