Martorana v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Brian R. Martorana
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2012cv00222
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Platte
Presiding Judge: Matt J. Whitworth
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2012 Filing 7 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to District of Delaware to be included in MDL No. 2358. Signed on June 12, 2012. Case electronically transferred. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from MDL court) (Russel, Jeri)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth no longer assigned to case Signed on June 1, 2012 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. (Terry, Bill)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 motion to stay all proceedings and deadlines until 45 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a ruling on any motion seeking coordination or consolidation of this and other related actions pending in other districts, or until further order of this Court or the MDL Transferee Court. Signed on 3/13/2012 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. No document attached. (Bode, Kay)
March 1, 2012 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to stay filed by Andrew Lyskowski on behalf of All Parties. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lyskowski, Andrew)
March 1, 2012 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brian R. Martorana. Google, Inc. served on 2/24/2012, answer due 3/16/2012. (Lyskowski, Andrew)
February 24, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc.. (Lock, Tania)
February 23, 2012 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/19/2012 (Lock, Tania)
February 22, 2012 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER - Case reassigned to the Central Division of the Western District of Missouri and randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Terry, Bill)
February 22, 2012 ***Remark: Randall O. Barnes notified via email of inactive status. (Martin, Jan)
February 21, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. filed by Andrew Lyskowski on behalf of Brian R. Martorana. Filing fee $350, receipt number 255PRC9C. Service due by 6/25/2012.(Lyskowski, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Jan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martorana v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian R. Martorana
Represented By: Randall O. Barnes
Represented By: Erik A Bergmanis
Represented By: Andrew Lyskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?