N.J. v. Viacom Incorporated et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: N.J.
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv04322
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Matt J. Whitworth
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by N.J.. (Robertson, Edward)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 unopposed motion to stay until 60 days after the Judicial Panel rules on forthcoming MDL motion or until further order of this Court or the MDL Transferee Court. Such stay shall include a continuance of defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed on 2/5/2013 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. No document attached. (Bode, Kay)
February 4, 2013 Filing 2 MOTION to stay Case Pending Outcome of MDL Determination filed by Edward D. Robertson, III on behalf of N.J.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Robertson, Edward)
January 24, 2013 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/24/2013 2nd Notice of Magistrate Assignment. This item has been deleted as it was entered on the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
January 24, 2013 2nd NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT-this entry has been deleted as it was posted in error. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Tania Lock) Modified on 1/24/2013 (Lock, Tania).
December 21, 2012 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/14/2013 (Bax, Laura)
December 21, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andrew Lyskowski on behalf of N. J.. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-3346521. Service due by 4/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyskowski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.J. v. Viacom Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.J.
Represented By: James P. Frickleton
Represented By: Andrew Lyskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?