Rosenthal v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
Kevin Rosenthal |
Defendant: |
Missouri Department of Corrections, George Lombardi, Ed Davis, James Hurley and John 1-10 Does |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv04150 |
Filed: |
June 11, 2013 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Jefferson City Office |
County: |
Cole |
Presiding Judge: |
Fernando J. Gaitan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
Americans with Disabilities Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 defendants' motion for summary judgment. Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART as to (a) all claims against Defendants Davis and Hurley; (b) Intervenor Dudley's claim in Counts I and II regar ding failure to provide video phones; and (c) Counts IV-XV of the First Amended Complaint. Summary Judgment is DENIED IN PART as to Intervenor Dudley's claims for injunctive relief in Counts I and II against Lombardi and the MDOC regarding sign language interpreters, visual and tactile alarms, and denial of access to a TTY telephone. Signed on 2/19/16 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
131
ORDER - 1) Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 103 is GRANTED IN PART as it relates to dismissal of claims against Defendants Lombardi, Davis, and Hurley in Counts I and II acting in their individual capacities as well as dismi ssal of Count III in its entirety, and DENIED IN PART as related to dismissal of Counts IV through XV; and 2) Defendants' Motion, by Consent, for Leave to Amend by Interlineation their Answer and Affirmative Defenses 124 is GRANTED, and defendants' answer will be considered amended by interlineation. Signed on 3/12/15 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER granting 80 defendants' motion to exclude Dr. Thomas Horejes as an expert witness. Signed on 12/4/14 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed on 10/16/14 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Main Document 92 replaced on 10/16/2014) (Wheeler, LaTandra).
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 defendants' Motion to Dismiss and granting 25 putative intervenor Deonta Dudley's motion to intervene. Putative Intervenor Dudley shall file his intervenor's complaint on or before JANUARY 29, 2014. Signed on 1/24/14 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?