Missourians for Fiscal Accountability v. Missouri Ethics Commission

Plaintiff: Missourians for Fiscal Accountability
Defendant: Missouri Ethics Commission
Case Number: 2:2014cv04287
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 35 Defendant's motion for summary judgment; granting 37 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed on 1/5/2017 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER AND OPINION DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 4/27/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
November 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 motion for TRO. Signed on 11/2/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Wolfe, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missourians for Fiscal Accountability v. Missouri Ethics Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missourians for Fiscal Accountability
Represented By: Christopher K. Gober
Represented By: Caleb Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Ethics Commission
Represented By: John A. Hirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?