Schumacher v. SC Data Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ria Schumacher
Defendant: SC Data Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv04078
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion for fees (Doc. 117 ) is DENIED. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Schumacher's motion for reconsideration (Doc. 103 ) is GRANTED. The Court REVERSES its decision dismissing Counts II and III, and DENIES SC's motion to dismiss (Doc. 16 ) in its entirety. (Sreeprakash, Netra) (Sreeprakash, Netra)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' joint motion for preliminary approval of class settlement, Doc. 72 , is granted on the condition that: (1) the settlement checks shall not expire for 180 days rather than the 90 days prov ided in Paragraph V.A.8. in Doc.[72-2], p. 11; and (2) the following two sentences are added to the end of Paragraph V.A.2. in Doc. [72-2], p. 10: "To the extent a notice is returned with a forwarding address, the Settlement Administrator will r e-mail the notice to the forwarding address. If any notice is returned as undeliverable, the Settlement Administrator will do a skip trace and if a new address is identified, will re-mail the notice"; and (3) the last three sentences of Paragra ph V.A.8. in Doc. [72-2], p. 11-12 are edited as provided in Section 1.c. of this Order. A final settlement approval hearing will be held at 10:00 a.m. on August 3, 2017, at 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101, District Courtroom 4A. Signed on 4/24/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Specker, Suzanne)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Defendant's motion to certify for interlocutory appeal, Doc. 62 , is denied. The Court further orders the parties to submit their proposed settlement documents for preliminary approval on or before 3/16/2017. Signed on 2/21/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Specker, Suzanne)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. SC Data's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, Doc. 16 , is denied. Schumacher's request for an order enforcing the settlement agreement is granted, Doc. 51 . The Court further orders the parties to submit their proposed settlement documents on or before 1/3/2017. (Specker, Suzanne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schumacher v. SC Data Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ria Schumacher
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Data Center, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Sanders
Represented By: John T. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?