Vogt v. State Farm Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael G. Vogt
Defendant: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv04170
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Court grants Class Counsel's motion for a fee award of one-third of the Common Fund ($34,322,414.84, plus $4,521,674.38 in prejudgment interest, plus post-judgment interest, which contin ues to accrue) and reimbursement of their expenses, which total $245,658.05. The motion for a service award for Mr. Vogt is granted in part; Mr. Vogt is awarded $15,000 from the Common Fund. Signed on 1/25/21 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 1/25/2021 to reflect NEF regenerated to notify US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit (Warren, Melissa).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. 427 ) to shift costs of providing notice to the class and distributing the judgment. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiffs' motion for prejudgment interest (Doc. 423 ) is granted. The judgment shall be amended accordingly. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. State Farm's Rule 50 motions for judgment as a matter of law and its Rule 59 motion for a new trial (Docs. 347 and 373 ) are denied. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER (REDACTED) granting Vogt's Motion to Certify Class 145. Signed on 4/20/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 166 . (Sreeprakash, Netra)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiff Vogt's Motion to Reconsider, Doc. 56 , is granted. The Court's dismissal of Count III for conversion is vacated. Signed on 4/26/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Specker, Suzanne)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendant State Farm's motion to dismiss, Doc. 12 , is granted for Plaintiff Vogt's Count III, conversion; dismissal is denied for the remainder of Vogt's claims. Plaintiff Vogt's motion for leave to amend, Doc. 31 , is denied. Signed on 2/3/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.(Specker, Suzanne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogt v. State Farm Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Vogt
Represented By: Joseph M Feierabend
Represented By: Matthew W. Lytle
Represented By: John J. Schirger
Represented By: Norman Eli Siegel
Represented By: Patrick J. Stueve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?