Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC v. Concannon
Plaintiff: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC
Defendant: Matthew Jerome Concannon
Case Number: 2:2016cv04280
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 12:1725
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Defendant Concannon's Motion to Amend Findings and Judgment, Doc. 84, is denied. Plaintiff Radiance Capital's Petition for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Doc. 83, is granted. Signed on 12/29/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. The Court now enters judgment in favor of Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC on its breach of Guaranty claim, in the amount of Fifteen Million Seven Hundred Sixty-Nine Thousand Seven Hundred Seventy-Four and 46/100 Dollars ($15,769,774.46) in principal; Ninety-Eight Thousand Eight Hundred Sixty-Four and 35/100 Dollars ($98,864.35) in interest accrued in the per diem amount of Four Thousand Two Hundred Ninety-Eight Dollars and 45/100 ($4,298.45) from Se ptember 1, 2014, through September 23, 2014; as of October 2, 2017, Six Million Four Hundred Thirteen Thousand Five Hundred Eighty Five and 15/100 Dollars ($6,413,585.15) in post-Consent Judgment interest is due and owing (the per diem amoun t of $5,804.15 since September 24, 2014 (1,105 days)), plus the costs of collection. The Court finds against Defendant Concannon on his defense of fraud in the factum. The Court finds against Plaintiff on its alternative claim, Count II, quantum meruit. Signed on 10/10/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Plaintiff Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 25, is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant Matthew Jerome Concannon's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 23, is denied. (Related Doc. 25 and 23 ) Signed on 9/20/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendant Concannon's motion to dismiss, Doc. 4 , is denied. (Barragan-Scott, Alana)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC v. Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jerome Concannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen, LLC
Represented By: Braden M. Perry
Represented By: Marc S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?