Bratton v. The Hershey Company
Plaintiff: Robert Bratton
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv04322
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Hershey's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 117 , is granted. Mr. Bratton's MMPA and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed with prejudice. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. The parties' Joint Motion for Order of Approval of Proposed Electronic Discovery Protocol, Doc. 76 , is granted. Signed on 6/14/2017 by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Barragan-Scott, Alana)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. Defendant The Hershey Company's motion to dismiss, Doc. 47 , is denied. Signed on 5/16/2017 by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Barragan-Scott, Alana)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. The Hershey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Michelle W. Cohen
Represented By: Sonette T Magnus
Represented By: Steven Alan Zalesin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bratton
Represented By: Stephen F. Gaunt
Represented By: David L. Steelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?