Missouri Electric Cooperatives et al v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Missouri Electric Cooperatives, Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives-PAC, David Klindt and Legends Bank
Defendant: State of Missouri, The Missouri Ethics Commission and Its Commissioners, Nancy Hagan, Bill Deeken, Eric L. Dirks, Don Summers, Kim Benjamin and George Ratermann
Intervenor_defendant: Todd Jones
Case Number: 2:2017cv04006
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Unknown
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting AMEC Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary and permanent injunction (Doc. #14); granting in part and denying in part FFEF Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary and permanent injunction (Case No. 16-4332, Doc. #18); granting Defenda nts' motion to dismiss party (Case No. 16-4332, Doc. #28); denying Defendants' motion to dismiss cases (Case No. 16-4332, Doc. #30); entering permanent injunction as detailed in Order; and staying enforcement of permanent injunction for forty-five days. Signed on 5/5/2017 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING MOVANT TODD JONES'S MOTION TO INTERVENE, 32 . Signed on 2/6/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to transfer venue 41 is granted, and this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Central Division (Jefferson City). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/17/2017. (CBL) [Transferred from moed on 1/19/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri Electric Cooperatives et al v. State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Electric Cooperatives
Represented By: James D. Bass
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Erin M Naeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives-PAC
Represented By: James D. Bass
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Erin M Naeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Klindt
Represented By: James D. Bass
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Erin M Naeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legends Bank
Represented By: James D. Bass
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Erin M Naeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Missouri Ethics Commission and Its Commissioners
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hagan
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Deeken
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Summers
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Benjamin
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ratermann
Represented By: Laura E. Elsbury
Represented By: Curtis Schube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Todd Jones
Represented By: Matthew H. Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?