Church et al v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Shondel Church, Randall Lee Dalton, Dorian Samuels, Viola Bowman and Brian Richman
Defendant: State of Missouri, Eric Greitens, Michael Barrett, H. Riley Bock, Charles R Jackson, Craig Chval and A. Crista Hogan
Case Number: 2:2017cv04057
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Nanette K. Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' joint motion for entry of the proposed consent judgment, Doc. 221 , is denied. Signed on 01/27/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Thompson, Amy)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, Doc. 52 , is denied.(Jackson, Rachel)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Non-Parties' Pro Se Motion for Joinder, [Doc. 30 ], is denied. (Farrington, Elizabeth)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church et al v. State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shondel Church
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Breihan
Represented By: Mae C Quinn
Represented By: Evan Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Represented By: Matthew R Shahabian
Represented By: Robert L Sills
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Lee Dalton
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Breihan
Represented By: Mae C Quinn
Represented By: Evan Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Represented By: Matthew R Shahabian
Represented By: Robert L Sills
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Samuels
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Breihan
Represented By: Mae C Quinn
Represented By: Evan Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Represented By: Matthew R Shahabian
Represented By: Robert L Sills
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Bowman
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Breihan
Represented By: Mae C Quinn
Represented By: Evan Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Represented By: Matthew R Shahabian
Represented By: Robert L Sills
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Richman
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Breihan
Represented By: Mae C Quinn
Represented By: Evan Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Represented By: Matthew R Shahabian
Represented By: Robert L Sills
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Greitens
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Barrett
Represented By: Jacqueline Shipma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Riley Bock
Represented By: Jacqueline Shipma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Jackson
Represented By: Jacqueline Shipma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Chval
Represented By: Jacqueline Shipma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Crista Hogan
Represented By: Jacqueline Shipma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?