Stross v. Mid Missouri Granite, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: William Perkins and Mid Missouri Granite, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04180
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of Dismissal. The above-styled action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 10/10/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of settlement by Alexander Stross (Voytas, Richard)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/26/2018. Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' motion for an extension of time, Doc. #8 , is granted. Defendants must file a response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 24, 2018. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jackson, Rachel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Mid Missouri Granite, LLC, William Perkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rackers, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Mid Missouri Granite, LLC, William Perkins (Attorney Christopher P. Rackers added to party Mid Missouri Granite, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher P. Rackers added to party William Perkins(pty:dft))(Rackers, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Alexander Stross. Mid Missouri Granite, LLC served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018; William Perkins served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander Stross (Voytas, Richard)
September 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURE. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 9/6/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Richard, Tracey)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 ***Remark AO-121 - Report on the Filing of an action sent via regular mail to the Register of Copyrights. (Geiser, Angel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mid Missouri Granite, LLC, William Perkins filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander Stross. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5925189. Service due by 12/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. Mid Missouri Granite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Perkins
Represented By: Christopher P. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Missouri Granite, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?