Mantlo v. Missouri School Boards Association
Plaintiff: Bob Mantlo
Defendant: Missouri School Boards Association
Case Number: 2:2018cv04184
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion for a stay, Doc. #16 , and motion for extension of time, Doc. #23 , are granted in part. The Court's Order on Rule 26 disclosures, Doc. #8 , and the Court's Scheduling Order, Doc. #19 , are stayed until an order regarding Plaintiff's motion to remand is issued. Parties must provide Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures no later than 5 days after that date. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jackson, Rachel)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION to remand filed by Molly R Batsch on behalf of Defendant Missouri School Boards Association. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Emmert v. Prenger, et al.)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Batsch, Molly)
October 9, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time filed by Chris Miller on behalf of Bob Mantlo. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, Chris)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Frank Neuner(Batsch, Molly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #16 MOTION to stay by Missouri School Boards Association. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Batsch, Molly)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 28, 2018 Filing 18 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Missouri School Boards Association. (Batsch, Molly)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION to stay filed by Chris Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Bob Mantlo. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Miller, Chris)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to stay filed by Chris Miller on behalf of Bob Mantlo. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, Chris)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION to remand filed by Chris Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Bob Mantlo. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Miller, Chris)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to remand filed by Chris Miller on behalf of Bob Mantlo. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, Chris)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Molly R Batsch on behalf of Missouri School Boards Association (Batsch, Molly)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Defendant Missouri School Boards Association.(Daming, Lauren)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Molly R Batsch for Missouri School Boards Association allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 Motion to allow Molly R. Batsch to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5930386) filed by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Missouri School Boards Association. (Daming, Lauren)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF THE FILING OF THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Missouri School Boards Association (Daming, Lauren)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/28/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 9/21/2018. Signed on 9/7/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Richard, Tracey)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURE. Signed on 9/7/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Richard, Tracey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of the Filing of the Notice of Removal by Missouri School Boards Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Daming, Lauren)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Defendant Missouri School Boards Association.(Daming, Lauren)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Missouri School Boards Association.(Daming, Lauren)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Missouri School Boards Association (Daming, Lauren)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court County, case number 18BA-CV02879, filed by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Missouri School Boards Association. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5928991. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Daming, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mantlo v. Missouri School Boards Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Mantlo
Represented By: Chris Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri School Boards Association
Represented By: Lauren Abbott Daming
Represented By: Molly R Batsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?