Thompson v. MPI Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Defendant: MPI Products and MPI Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04217
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 The Court acknowledges Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal of claims against Defendant without prejudice (Doc. #11). Plaintiff's claims against Defendant MPI Products, Inc. are, with Defendant having no objection, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 12/11/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to the Court's trial schedule, Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/14/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Robert C. Sullivan on behalf of David Thompson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sullivan, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/23/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 11/9/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 10/25/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 It is ORDERED Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(1)(1)(A)(i) (Doc. #8) is insufficient, in light of Defendant's answer, to dismiss the action. Plaintiff shall file a motion for voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) on or before November 8, 2018. Signed on 10/25/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by David Thompson (Sullivan, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Melissa R. Null on behalf of MPI Products. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Null, Melissa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Melissa R. Null on behalf of Defendant MPI Products. (Null, Melissa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing by MPI Products (Null, Melissa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Melissa R. Null on behalf of Defendant MPI Products.(Null, Melissa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Melissa R. Null on behalf of MPI Products (Null, Melissa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County County, case number 18ML-CC00076, filed by Melissa R. Null on behalf of MPI Products. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5995607. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Null, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. MPI Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Represented By: Robert C. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPI Products
Represented By: Melissa R. Null
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPI Products, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa R. Null
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?