Smith v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Erica Renee Smith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv04263
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erica Renee Smith. U.S. Attorney General served on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Mail Receipt- US Attorney General)(Woods, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erica Renee Smith. United States of America served on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Mail Receipts-US MOWD)(Woods, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 1/2/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 27, 2018 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED, and emailed to plaintiff's attorney, as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Two (2) summons issued, as provided to the Clerk's Office. (Geiser, Angel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Erica Renee Smith. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6096189. Service due by 3/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Woods, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Geiser, Angel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Renee Smith
Represented By: Matthew B. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?