Sevier et al v. Baker
Plaintiff: John Gunter, Jr. and Mark Christopher Sevier, Esq.
Defendant: Patrick Baker
Case Number: 2:2019cv04047
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 3/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Johnson, Melesa)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT mailed to plaintiffs. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for order to non-suit claims without prejudice by John Gunter, Jr. filed by John Gunter, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Geiser, Angel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Gunter, Jr, Mark Christopher Sevier, Esq. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Geiser, Angel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #6 Envelope) (Geiser, Angel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevier et al v. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Christopher Sevier, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?