Kemp v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ronald Orville Kemp
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04113
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doc.#7) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 6, 2019. Signed on 7/17/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/9/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 7/16/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint [unopposed] filed by Charles M. Thomas on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Thomas, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew B Wood Plaintiffs Attorney Pursuant to RsMO538.225 Regarding Expert Doctor Mary Beth Schueth by Ronald Orville Kemp. (Woods, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew B Wood Plaintiffs Attorney Pursuant to RsMO538.225 Regarding Expert Doctor Gerald Sokol by Ronald Orville Kemp. (Woods, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Orville Kemp.(Woods, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Orville Kemp of Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Defendant United States of America filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Orville Kemp.(Woods, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Ronald Orville Kemp. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6341946. Service due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Woods, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Geiser, Angel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Orville Kemp
Represented By: Matthew B. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?