Oestreich v. USA
Petitioner: Pamela J. Oestreich
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv04120
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Respondent's motion for an extension for time, up to and including August 16, 2019, in which to file a response in this case (Doc. #5 ) is granted. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a clear demonstration of extraordinary circumstances. Signed on July 17, 2019 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Michael Scott Oliver on behalf of USA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Oliver, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Scott Oliver on behalf of USA (Attorney Michael Scott Oliver added to party USA(pty:res))(Oliver, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: ORDERED that Respondent answer Movant's allegations and show cause on or before July 17, 2019, why the relief Movant seeks should not be granted. Signed on June 17, 2019 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Davies, Cindy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Pamela J. Oestreich.(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oestreich v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela J. Oestreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Michael Scott Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?