Campbell v. Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Campbell
Defendant: Kandi Williams, Michael J Vierra, Kandi Padgett, Lake Regional Health System, Jane and John Doe #1-10, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Lake Regional Allied Services and Rene Revelle
Case Number: 2:2019cv04124
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION for more definite statement and Suggestions in Support filed by Joshua L. Hill on behalf of Defendants Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Hill, Joshua)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams. (Hill, Joshua)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Joshua L. Hill on behalf of Defendants Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams.(Hill, Joshua)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell.(Davis, Grant)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION for more definite statement and Suggestions in Support filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell. Reply suggestions due by 8/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Davis, Grant)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION to dismiss case and Suggestions in Support filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell. Reply suggestions due by 8/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Davis, Grant)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J Vierra filed by Ryan E. Bertels on behalf of Defendant Michael J Vierra.(Bertels, Ryan)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Robert J. Buckley on behalf of Michael J Vierra (Attorney Robert J. Buckley added to party Michael J Vierra(pty:dft))(Buckley, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Ryan E. Bertels on behalf of Michael J Vierra. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bertels, Ryan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan E. Bertels on behalf of Michael J Vierra (Attorney Ryan E. Bertels added to party Michael J Vierra(pty:dft))(Bertels, Ryan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 8/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/1/2019. Signed on 7/18/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for more definite statement and Suggestions in Support filed by Joshua L. Hill on behalf of Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hill, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Michael J Vierra served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Davis, Grant)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Joshua L. Hill on behalf of Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams (Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Lake Regional Allied Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Lake Regional Health System(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Kandi Padgett(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Rene Revelle(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua L. Hill added to party Kandi Williams(pty:dft))(Hill, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams. (Clausen, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Edward C. Clausen on behalf of Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Kandi Williams (Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Lake Regional Allied Services(pty:dft), Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Lake Regional Health System(pty:dft), Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon(pty:dft), Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Kandi Padgett(pty:dft), Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Rene Revelle(pty:dft), Attorney Edward C. Clausen added to party Kandi Williams(pty:dft))(Clausen, Edward)
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lake Regional Allied Services, Lake Regional Health System, Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon, Kandi Padgett, Rene Revelle, Michael J Vierra, Kandi Williams. (Woods, Gloria)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 6/20/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to take deposition of Kandi Padgett, LPN filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell.(Davis, Grant)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to take deposition of Kandi Williams, LPN filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell.(Davis, Grant)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to take deposition of Rene Revelle, FNP filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Campbell.(Davis, Grant)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Grant L. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6364715. Service due by 9/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandi Williams
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Vierra
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Represented By: Robert J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandi Padgett
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Regional Health System
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Regional Medical Management, Inc. d/b/a Lake Regional Medical Urgent Care - Eldon
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Regional Allied Services
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Revelle
Represented By: Edward C. Clausen
Represented By: Joshua L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Campbell
Represented By: Travis W. Shumate
Represented By: Michael L. Wilson
Represented By: Grant L. Davis
Represented By: Scott S. Bethune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?