Downey et al v. Department of Justice-Attorney General et al
Defendant: US Attorney-Department of Justice, Department of Justice-Attorney General and National Assn of Government Labor Officials
Not Yet Classified: Mark Downey, United States of America and Estate of Virginia Downey
Case Number: 2:2019cv04134
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. #6 ). An appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if it would be frivolous and therefore could not be taken in good faith. Franklin v. Dormire, No. 04-0335, 2009 WL 962285, at *1 (E.D. Mo. Apr. 7, 2009) (citing Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962)); see also 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a). Because the Court has found that Plaintiff's claims are frivolous (see Doc. #3 ), the Court denies the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office shall mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. Signed on August 14, 2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) Modified on 8/14/2019, document mailed to pro se plaintiff at Drawer SS, McClean, VA 22101-729 (James, Carrie).
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit is 19-2259 for #5 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Downey. Briefing schedule entered by the Court of Appeals is attached. Fee/IFP due on 08/23/2019. Entry of Appearance due 08/23/2019. Appellant's Informal brief is due 09/03/2019. (Geiser, Angel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal and docket sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit, via e-mail to appeal@cafc.uscourts.gov. Related document #5 Notice of Appeal. Copy mailed to plaintiff Mark Downey. (Geiser, Angel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION for leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Mark Downey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope USCA Envelope, #3 USCA Letter)(Geiser, Angel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order of Dismissal, and #4 Clerk's Judgment by Mark Downey. Filing fee $ NOT PAID, receipt number NOT PAID. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope USCA, #3 USCA Letter)(Geiser, Angel) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/5/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Richard, Tracey)(CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of the Dismissal Order (Doc. 3) and Clerk's Judgment (Doc. 4) was mailed via 1st class mail to: Mark Downey at Drawer SS, McClean, VA 22101-0729.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. #1 , is denied. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. All other pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal and close the case. Signed on 7/10/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Richard, Tracey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for order to participate in case without appearing filed by Mark Downey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(James, Carrie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Downey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Supplemental Statement of Claim, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(Lock, Tania)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey et al v. Department of Justice-Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney-Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice-Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Assn of Government Labor Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Estate of Virginia Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?