Thomas v. Lehman
Plaintiff: Nicholas Thomas
Defendant: Joshua Lehman
Case Number: 2:2019cv04143
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). (Willis, Kathy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the balance of the $350.00 filing fee is paid ($312.77); and(2) this case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). Signed on 08/06/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (CLERK'S NOTE: Collect filing fee letter mailed to MO-DOC Finance Office with copy of 08/06/19 Order as directed.)(Willis, Kathy).
August 5, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO079069 in the amount of $37.23 issued to Nicholas Thomas. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 8/5/2019 to correct receipt amount. (Woods, Gloria).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before August 16, 2019 as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on August 2, 2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $37.23; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before August 1, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on July 18, 2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Davies, Cindy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Thomas. (Davies, Cindy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Nicholas Thomas. (Davies, Cindy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Lehman filed by Nicholas Thomas. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?