United States of America v. $50,005 in United States currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: InTech 28 enclosed trailer, VIN: 1Z9TT2825JN374920, $16,148 in United States currency, 2016 Kubota skid steer tractor, serial number 30780, 2018 Honda Pioneer utility task vehicle, VIN: 1HFVEO4T2J4200101, 2011 Boat Mate boat trailer, VIN: 5A7BB2422BT002737, 2011 Tige RZ4 ski boat, HIN: TIX0286DD111, 2019 Mercedes S63 AMG, VIN: WDDUG8JB3KA445444, $14,895 in United States currency, $50,005 in United States currency, 2016 GMC Denali Callaway Edition, VIN: 1GKS2HKJ7GR174097, $249,184 in United States currency, 2014 BMW i3, VIN: WBY1Z3C57EVX63067 and Craig DeWitt Smith, Jr.
Claimant: Bank of America N.A. and GM Financial
Case Number: 2:2019cv04151
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Angela Williams on behalf of Craig DeWitt Smith, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Angela)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 CLAIM filed by GM Financial. GM Financial answer due 10/8/2019. on behalf of Claimant GM Financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of title)(Attorney Jill D Olsen added to party GM Financial(pty:clm))(Olsen, Jill)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey Proposed scheduling order due by 10/31/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/24/2019. Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 CLAIM filed by Bank of America N.A.. Bank of America N.A. answer due 10/2/2019. on behalf of Claimant Bank of America N.A.. (Attorney Jennifer L. Berhorst added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:clm))(Berhorst, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Kurt Petersen by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 10/3/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/26/2019. Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, on behalf of Craig DeWitt Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Mara Smith)(Attorney Angela Williams added to party Craig DeWitt Smith, Jr(pty:dft))(Williams, Angela)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to All Defendants. All Defendants served on 8/27/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Harvey Caron by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Courtesy Automotive Center by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to First Interstate Bank by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Kurt Petersen by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to GM Financial by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Bank of America by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Mara Smith by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Craig Smith by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/23/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr no longer assigned to case. Case number shall now read 2:19-cv-4151-NKL. Signed on 07/23/2019 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against $14,895 in United States currency, $16,148 in United States currency, $249,184 in United States currency, $50,005 in United States currency, 2011 Boat Mate boat trailer, VIN: 5A7BB2422BT002737, 2011 Tige RZ4 ski boat, HIN: TIX0286DD111, 2014 BMW i3, VIN: WBY1Z3C57EVX63067, 2016 GMC Denali Callaway Edition, VIN: 1GKS2HKJ7GR174097, 2016 Kubota skid steer tractor, serial number 30780, 2018 Honda Pioneer utility task vehicle, VIN: 1HFVEO4T2J4200101, 2019 Mercedes S63 AMG, VIN: WDDUG8JB3KA445444, InTech 28 enclosed trailer, VIN: 1Z9TT2825JN374920 filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $50,005 in United States currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InTech 28 enclosed trailer, VIN: 1Z9TT2825JN374920
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,148 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Kubota skid steer tractor, serial number 30780
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Honda Pioneer utility task vehicle, VIN: 1HFVEO4T2J4200101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Boat Mate boat trailer, VIN: 5A7BB2422BT002737
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Tige RZ4 ski boat, HIN: TIX0286DD111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019 Mercedes S63 AMG, VIN: WDDUG8JB3KA445444
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,895 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,005 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 GMC Denali Callaway Edition, VIN: 1GKS2HKJ7GR174097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $249,184 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 BMW i3, VIN: WBY1Z3C57EVX63067
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig DeWitt Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Angela Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Berhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: GM Financial
Represented By: Jill D Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?