Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. et al v. Parson et al
Plaintiff: Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. and DO, MSCI, FACOG Colleen P. McNicholas
Defendant: MD, FACP Marc K Taormina, DO James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, DO David E Tannehill, Eric S Schmitt, Michael L Parson, MD Jade D James, Kimberly M Gardner, MD Sammy L Alexander, Katherine J Mathews, MD Randall Williams, MD Naveed Razzaque and PhD, MPP, MPH Sarah Martin
Case Number: 2:2019cv04155
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER regarding Down Syndrome - The order entered on August 27, 2019 (Doc. #51 ; 389 F.Supp.3d at 640) is hereby MODIFIED to prohibit the Missouri official defendants, their employees, agents and successors in office from enforcing, pending litigation, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.038.2. insofar as it relates to non-viable fetuses. SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/27/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kelly D. Garcia for Colleen P. McNicholas and Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 67 Motion to allow Kelly D. Garcia to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6500701) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #59 MOTION for reconsideration re #51 Order, or, in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Benson, Arthur)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - DENYING #54 State Defendant's motion for partial stay pending the appeal of the preliminary injunction. Signed on 9/18/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #54 MOTION to stay re #51 Order, State Defendants' Motion for Partial Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal State Defendants' Reply Brief Supporting A Partial Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Sauer, Dean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 63 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #54 MOTION to stay re #51 Order, State Defendants' Motion for Partial Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Benson, Arthur)
September 11, 2019 Filing 62 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #59 MOTION for reconsideration re #51 Order, or, in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Reply suggestions due by 9/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Sauer, Dean)
September 5, 2019 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM TO COUNSEL relating to Court rulings while an appeal is pending. Signed on 9/5/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 60 SUGGESTIONS in support re #59 MOTION for reconsideration re #51 Order, or, in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Colleen P. McNicholas, D.O., M.S.C.I., F.A.C.O.G.)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Benson, Arthur)
September 4, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for reconsideration re #51 Order, or, in the Alternative, for a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Benson, Arthur)
September 3, 2019 Filing 58 USCA Case Number from Eighth Circuit is 19-2882 for #53 Notice of Appeal, filed by David E Tannehill, Randall Williams, Naveed Razzaque, Sarah Martin, Michael L Parson, Sammy L Alexander, Jade D James, Eric S Schmitt, James A DiRenna, Marc K Taormina, Jeffrey S Glaser, Katherine J Mathews. Briefing schedule entered by the Court of Appeals is attached. (Attachments: #1 USCA Briefing Schedule)(Geiser, Angel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 57 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #53 Notice of Appeal. (Lock, Tania)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Briefing on issues other than Doc. 54 are STAYED. Signed on 8/30/2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Plaintiffs' time to respond to certain defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 32) is extended to September 9, 2019. Signed on 8/29/2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
August 29, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to stay re #51 Order, State Defendants' Motion for Partial Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Sauer, Dean)
August 29, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #50 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, #51 Order, by Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOWDC-6468280. (Sauer, Dean)
August 28, 2019 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held 8/26/2019 before Judge Howard F. Sachs. Court Reporter: Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. Number of pages: 60. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties' intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.mow.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. Notice of Intent to File Redaction of Transcripts due by 9/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019.(Crawford, Jean)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED ORDER and MEMORANDUM, re #50 ORDER and MEMORANDUM. Amended to correct typographical errors. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Main Document 51 replaced on 8/27/2019 to correct middle initial of Judge electronic signature) (Anderson, Christy).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER and MEMORANDUM - It is hereby ORDERED that the Missouri official defendants, their employees, agents, and successors in office are hereby PROHIBITED, pending litigation or further order of the Court, from enforcing certain pre-viability bans on abortions, pursuant to H.B. 126; specifically, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.056, 188.057, 188.158, 188.375. The motion for preliminary injunction is hereby DENIED without prejudice as to 188.038. Jurisdiction is retained to modify this order pending litigation, on motion or to make certain corrections. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 49 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Howard F. Sachs: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/26/2019. The matter of the preliminary injunction has been taken under advisement by the Court. The Court orally grants plaintiff's oral motion for extension of the Motion to Dismiss deadlines. Plaintiff's Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Time in court: 1:32 p.m. to 3:09 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, Christy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to order re #30 Scheduling Order, State Defendants' List of Supplemental Authorities for Reference at Oral Argument filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Sauer, Dean)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION and Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order. Docket modified re #43 to show response filed. Reply suggestions due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Mary Norton, M.D., #2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Steven J. Ralston, M.D., M.P.H., #3 Exhibit 3-Reply Declaration of Colleen P. McNicholas, D.O., M.S.C.I, F.A.C.O.G., #4 Exhibit 4-Reply Declaration of Michael W. Bebbington, M.D., M.H.Sc.)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Benson, Arthur)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #44 Plaintiffs are directed to immediately file their reply brief exceeding the page limitation by five pages. Signed on 8/23/2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
August 23, 2019 Filing 45 SUGGESTIONS in support re #44 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Lansford, Jamie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lansford, Jamie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Dawn M Parsons on behalf of Defendant Kimberly M Gardner. Reply suggestions due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Parsons, Dawn) Modified on 8/26/2019 to show response filed and set reply deadlines (Geiser, Angel).
August 23, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE to motion re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Dawn M Parsons on behalf of Defendant Kimberly M Gardner. Reply suggestions due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Parsons, Dawn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of appearance by Dawn M Parsons on behalf of Kimberly M Gardner (Attorney Dawn M Parsons added to party Kimberly M Gardner(pty:dft))(Parsons, Dawn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of appearance by Omri E Praiss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Omri E Praiss added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Omri E Praiss added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Praiss, Omri)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 08/20/2019 as Document No. 38, Notice of Appearance. Document text has been modified to show amended notice filed. Dean John Sauer removed as attorney of record from defendant Katherine Gardner. (Related Documents #14 , #38 ) This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - GRANTING #34 motion to exceed page limit. Signed on 8/20/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED NOTICE of appearance by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams (Sauer, Dean) Modified on 8/21/2019 to show amended document filed. (Geiser, Angel).
August 20, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY SUGGESTIONS re #34 MOTION for leave to file Opposition to Preliminary Injunction that Exceeds Page Limit filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Sauer, Dean) Modified on 8/21/2019 to modify event to show reply suggestions filed(Geiser, Angel).
August 19, 2019 Filing 36 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #34 MOTION for leave to file Opposition to Preliminary Injunction that Exceeds Page Limit filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Lansford, Jamie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Reply suggestions due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Sauer, Dean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to file Opposition to Preliminary Injunction that Exceeds Page Limit filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sauer, Dean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 SUGGESTIONS in support re #32 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Sauer, Dean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sauer, Dean)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to order re #30 Scheduling Order, State Defendants' Disclosure of Persons Offering Exhibits filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendants Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Sauer, Dean)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER ADDENDUM: Counsel for defendants are directed to identify any persons offering exhibits and a brief explanation of the subject matter of said exhibits. Such information shall be filed on or before August 16, 2019. On August 26, 2019 before 10:00 a.m., the parties shall list any citations that will likely be referred to in argument, if not previously referred to in briefing. Signed on 8/6/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Justin D. Smith on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams (Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Sammy L Alexander(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party James A DiRenna(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Jeffrey S Glaser(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Jade D James(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Sarah Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Katherine J Mathews(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Michael L Parson(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Naveed Razzaque(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Eric S Schmitt(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party David E Tannehill(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Marc K Taormina(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D. Smith added to party Randall Williams(pty:dft))(Smith, Justin)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Craig Benson for Colleen P. McNicholas and Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to allow Craig Benson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6428426) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #7 , #8 , #10 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , and #22 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Fiona Kaye, Andrew Beck, Susan Lambiase, Julie Murray, Claudia Hammerman, Jane O'Brien, Daniel J. Klein, Allison C. Penfield, Melina M. Meneguine Layerenza, and Melissa R. Alpert for Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. and for Colleen P. McNicholas, allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by Emily A. Dodge on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams (Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Sammy L Alexander(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party James A DiRenna(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Jeffrey S Glaser(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Jade D James(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Sarah Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Katherine J Mathews(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Michael L Parson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Naveed Razzaque(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Eric S Schmitt(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party David E Tannehill(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Marc K Taormina(pty:dft), Attorney Emily A. Dodge added to party Randall Williams(pty:dft))(Dodge, Emily)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/26/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6C Kansas City (DRD) before District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of appearance by Jessie Steffan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Steffan, Jessie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to allow Melissa Alpert to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424920) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to allow Melina M. Meneguin Layerenza to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424919) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to allow Allison Penfield to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424918) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to allow Daniel Klein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424912) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to allow Jane O'Brien to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424909) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow Claudia Hammerman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424891) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to allow Julie Murray to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6424881) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lansford, Jamie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Julie Marie Blake on behalf of Sammy L Alexander, James A DiRenna, Jeffrey S Glaser, Jade D James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J Mathews, Michael L Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S Schmitt, David E Tannehill, Marc K Taormina, Randall Williams (Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Sammy L Alexander(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party James A DiRenna(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Jeffrey S Glaser(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Jade D James(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Sarah Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Katherine J Mathews(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Michael L Parson(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Naveed Razzaque(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Eric S Schmitt(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party David E Tannehill(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Marc K Taormina(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party Randall Williams(pty:dft))(Blake, Julie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Dean John Sauer on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Sammy L Alexander(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party James A DiRenna(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Kimberly M Gardner(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Jeffrey S Glaser(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Jade D James(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Sarah Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Katherine J Mathews(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Michael L Parson(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Naveed Razzaque(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Eric S Schmitt(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party David E Tannehill(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Marc K Taormina(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party Randall Williams(pty:dft))(Sauer, Dean)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral argument (if desired) is scheduled for August 26, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., at a courtroom to be designated at the Kansas City courthouse. Suggestions in opposition to the motion (together with any exhibits deemed appropriate)shall be filed on or before August 19, 2019. Reply suggestions, if any, shall be filed on or before August 23, 2019. Signed on 7/31/2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wilcox, Gillian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Susan Lambiase to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6423786) filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lansford, Jamie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Arthur A. Benson added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur A. Benson added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Benson, Arthur)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Andrew Beck to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6422971) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rothert, Anthony)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Fiona Kaye to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6422972) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rothert, Anthony)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Colleen P. McNicholas(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony E. Rothert added to party Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rothert, Anthony)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF CORPORATE DISCLOSURES Plaintiff Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Statement by Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. (Lansford, Jamie) Modified on 7/31/2019 to correct event(Geiser, Angel).
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Pursuant to Administrative Directive 13, this case was randomly reassigned to the Honorable Howard F. Sachs for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 2:19-04155-CV-C-HFS. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUGGESTIONS in support re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Plaintiffs Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, McNicholas Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Bebbington Declaration)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Lansford, Jamie) Modified on 7/31/2019 exhibit 2 replaced with redacted version. NEF regenerated to all parties.(Kern, Kendra)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lansford, Jamie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford on behalf of Colleen P. McNicholas, Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6422770. Service due by 10/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.056, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.057, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.058, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.375, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, Mo. Rev. Stat. 188.038, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lansford, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. et al v. Parson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD, FACP Marc K Taormina
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO James A DiRenna
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Glaser
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO David E Tannehill
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S Schmitt
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Parson
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Jade D James
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly M Gardner
Represented By: Dawn M Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Sammy L Alexander
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine J Mathews
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Randall Williams
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Naveed Razzaque
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhD, MPP, MPH Sarah Martin
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Emily A. Dodge
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Allison C. Penfield
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza
Represented By: Craig Benson
Represented By: Kelly D. Garcia
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Melissa R. Alpert
Represented By: Julie Murray
Represented By: Daniel J. Klein
Represented By: Andrew Beck
Represented By: Omri E Praiss
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Jane B O'Brien
Represented By: Claudia Hammerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DO, MSCI, FACOG Colleen P. McNicholas
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Allison C. Penfield
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Melina Maria Meneguin Layerenza
Represented By: Craig Benson
Represented By: Kelly D. Garcia
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Melissa R. Alpert
Represented By: Julie Murray
Represented By: Daniel J. Klein
Represented By: Andrew Beck
Represented By: Omri E Praiss
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Represented By: Jane B O'Brien
Represented By: Claudia Hammerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?