Depositors Insurance Company v. Kever et al
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Defendant: Laura Alderson, Cynthia Kever, Joseph Alderson and John Kever
Case Number: 2:2019cv04162
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order of Dismissal. The above-styled action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 45 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 10/3/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 9/25/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 02:00 PM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 9/25/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Depositors Insurance Company. (Watters, Russell)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Blake I. Markus on behalf of Defendants Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson.(Markus, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Russell F. Watters on behalf of Plaintiff Depositors Insurance Company.(Watters, Russell)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Russell F. Watters on behalf of Plaintiff Depositors Insurance Company.(Watters, Russell)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Wally Bley(Watters, Russell)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/19/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/12/2019. Signed on 8/29/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed on behalf of Cynthia Kever, John Kever.(Campbell, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Ernest Campbell on behalf of Cynthia Kever, John Kever (Attorney Michael Ernest Campbell added to party Cynthia Kever(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ernest Campbell added to party John Kever(pty:dft))(Campbell, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Blake I. Markus on behalf of Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson (Markus, Blake)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson.(Attorney Blake I. Markus added to party Joseph Alderson(pty:dft), Attorney Blake I. Markus added to party Laura Alderson(pty:dft))(Markus, Blake)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Depositors Insurance Company. John Kever served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Watters, Russell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Depositors Insurance Company. Laura Alderson served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Watters, Russell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Depositors Insurance Company. Joseph Alderson served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Watters, Russell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Depositors Insurance Company. Cynthia Kever served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Watters, Russell)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(James, Carrie)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 8/8/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 8, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney as to Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson, Cynthia Kever, John Kever. (Geiser, Angel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Joseph Alderson, Laura Alderson, Cynthia Kever, John Kever filed by Russell F. Watters on behalf of Depositors Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6436392. Service due by 11/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Watters, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depositors Insurance Company v. Kever et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Alderson
Represented By: Blake I. Markus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Kever
Represented By: Michael Ernest Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Alderson
Represented By: Blake I. Markus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kever
Represented By: Michael Ernest Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?