Holley et al. v. BSH Home Appliances Corp. et al.
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Holley and David Holley
Defendant: BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04168
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/4/19 at 10:15 a.m. has been cancelled. The Court will contact the parties to set phone conference to discuss Doc. # 11 at a later date. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to continue Deadlines in Court's August 18, 2019 Order filed by Michelle L. Corrigan on behalf of BSH Home Appliances Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Corrigan, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Nicole Renae Marcotte on behalf of BSH Home Appliances Corporation (Attorney Nicole Renae Marcotte added to party BSH Home Appliances Corporation(pty:dft))(Marcotte, Nicole)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Ronald C Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Ronald C Miller added to party David Holley(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald C Miller added to party Elisabeth Holley(pty:pla))(Miller, Ronald)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Certificate filed by Michelle L. Corrigan on behalf of Defendant BSH Home Appliances Corporation.(Corrigan, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to dismiss case or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Petition filed by Michelle L. Corrigan on behalf of Defendant BSH Home Appliances Corporation. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Corrigan, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss case or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Petition filed by Michelle L. Corrigan on behalf of BSH Home Appliances Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Corrigan, Michelle)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal by BSH Home Appliances Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Corrigan, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/18/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/19/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs by BSH Home Appliances Corporation (Corrigan, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cole County Circuit Court, Missouri County, case number 19AC-CC00283, filed by Michelle L. Corrigan on behalf of BSH Home Appliances Corp.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6449398. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Corrigan, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holley et al. v. BSH Home Appliances Corp. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSH Home Appliances Corporation
Represented By: Michelle L. Corrigan
Represented By: Nicole Renae Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Holley
Represented By: William Francis Whealen, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Holley
Represented By: William Francis Whealen, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?