Hawkins v. Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards
Plaintiff: Robert Wayne Hawkins
Defendant: Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards
Case Number: 2:2019cv04189
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B, Jefferson City (VDJJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 8/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are asked to call: 877-336-1839; access code: 6328169 to participate in the conference. Signed on 11/21/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/21/2019; order to issue. Matters discussed re: pending mediation; parties shall contact the Court to set an additional teleconference, if necessary. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): William D. Rotts. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Gregory Todd Cook, telephonic. Time in court: 9:33 a.m. to 9:43 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Wayne Hawkins re #11 CERTIFICATE of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures 1st Supplemental Disclosures filed by William D. Rotts on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Wayne Hawkins. Related document: #11 CERTIFICATE of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures filed by Robert Wayne Hawkins.(Rotts, William)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 MOTION for leave to appear Telephonically for Pretrial Conference filed by Robert Wayne Hawkins. Counsel is allowed to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference set on 11/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel shall call: 877-336-1839; access code: 6328169 to participate in the conference. Signed on 11/20/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/19/2019 as Document No. 14, Motion to Appear. The motion has been deleted as it contained a signature line for the presiding judge. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be separate from the motion and emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. Counsel is directed to correct document, according to administrative procedures, and re-file the motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear Telephonically for Pretrial Conference filed by William D. Rotts on behalf of Robert Wayne Hawkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rotts, William) Modified on 11/20/2019 to delete document pursuant to administrative procedures (Geiser, Angel).
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Byron A Bowles on behalf of Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards (Attorney Byron A Bowles added to party Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards(pty:dft))(Bowles, Byron)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Wayne Hawkins Request for Production of Documents and Things filed by William D. Rotts on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Wayne Hawkins.(Rotts, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by William D. Rotts on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Wayne Hawkins.(Rotts, William)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Lou Leonatti (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rotts, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Robert Wayne Hawkins. (Rotts, William)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards. (Cook, Gregory)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards.(Cook, Gregory)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/31/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 10/1/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Gregory Todd Cook on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards.(Cook, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Defendant's Submission of Pleadings from State Court Action by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards (Attachments: #1 Pleadings from State Court Action)(Cook, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cook, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County, Missouri County, case number 19BA-CV03548, filed by Gregory Todd Cook on behalf of Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6511469. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wayne Hawkins
Represented By: William D. Rotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards
Represented By: Gregory Todd Cook
Represented By: Byron A Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?