Missouri Coalition for the Environment v. Wheeler
Plaintiff: Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation
Defendant: Andrew R Wheeler
Case Number: 2:2019cv04215
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/21/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 2/14/2020. Signed on 1/30/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Perry Rosen on behalf of Andrew R Wheeler (Attorney Perry Rosen added to party Andrew R Wheeler(pty:dft))(Rosen, Perry)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation. Wheeler served on 12/9/2019. (Hubertz, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff must, within 14 days of the date of this order, file proof that Defendant has been properly served pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Signed on 12/19/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/19/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a change in Judge assignment only. The case number shall now read 2:19-cv-4215-NKL. Text entry only. No document attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation. Wheeler served on 12/9/2019. (Hubertz, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation. Wheeler served on 12/9/2019. (Hubertz, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation. Wheeler served on 12/9/2019. (Hubertz, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/4/2019 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Elizabeth J. Hubertz on behalf of Plaintiff Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation.(Hubertz, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2019 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew R Wheeler, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Lock, Tania)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lock, Tania)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Hubertz on behalf of Missouri Coalition for the Environment. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Client Consent)(Hubertz, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/4/2019 to modify event (Geiser, Angel).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Missouri Coalition for the Environment Missouri Coalition for the Environment. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6610611. Service due by 3/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hubertz, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri Coalition for the Environment v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R Wheeler
Represented By: Perry Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Hubertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?