Clark v. Ramey et al
Plaintiff: Alan R Clark
Defendant: Earl Scott, Paliska, Leland Burton, Masonda Wheatly, Eileen Ramey and Derek Pliska
Case Number: 2:2019cv04231
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that: the Court has received a discovery request or response from Plaintiff, which will not be filed in the case. As explained in this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order, the Local Rules require that such documents be served on the parties directly and not be sent to the Court for filing. When the discovery request or response has been served, the party that served the discovery document must then file a certificate of service. The certificate of service that accompanied the discovery documents has been filed. Signed on February 25, 2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Defendants Ramey, Burton, and Pliska's motion for an extension of time in which to file suggestions in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Doc. #24 ) is granted, but with the suggestions due no later than March 2, 2020; (2) Defendant Scott and Wheatly's motion to seal documents containing Plaintiff's medical information (Doc. #21 ) is denied, and the Clerk of the Court shall unseal any such documents; (3) Plaintiff's motion for appointed counsel (Doc. #27 ) is denied without prejudice; and (4) Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. #28 ) is granted, and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by March 17, 2020. Signed on 02/25/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Willis, Kathy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 28 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for leave to file amended complaint filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2020. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits and Declaration)(Davies, Cindy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/6/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 26 PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alan R Clark.(Davies, Cindy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF'S SUGGESTIONS in opposition to Doc. #21 MOTION to seal document filed by Alan R Clark. Reply suggestions due by 3/6/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #8 MOTION for reconsideration filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Leland Burton, Derek Pliska, Eileen Ramey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Blanton, Mark)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION for order Emergency motion to compel independent physical examination and treatment "Defendants Ramey, Burton and Pliska's Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff Clark's Motion to Compel an Independent Medical Exam of Plaintiff and Treatment" filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendants Leland Burton, Derek Pliska, Eileen Ramey. Reply suggestions due by 3/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Blanton, Mark)
February 17, 2020 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in opposition (SEALED) re #8 MOTION for reconsideration, #16 MOTION for order Emergency motion to compel independent physical examination and treatment filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Defendants Earl Scott, Masonda Wheatly. Reply suggestions due by 3/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Earl Scott, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Select portions of medical records for Plaintiff)(Related document(s) #8 , #16 ) (Eckenrode, J.) (CLERK'S NOTE: Documents unsealed as directed by Order dated 02/25/2020.)
February 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to seal document DEFENDANTS EARL SCOTT, M.D., AND MASONDA WHEATLEYS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Earl Scott, Masonda Wheatly. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Eckenrode, J.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Leland Burton, Derek Pliska, Eileen Ramey (Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Leland Burton(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Derek Pliska(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Eileen Ramey(pty:dft))(Blanton, Mark)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to order re #9 Order,,,, filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendants Leland Burton, Eileen Ramey, Derek Pliska. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Blanton, Mark)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Defendants file any suggestions in opposition to Plaintiff's "Emergency Motion to Compel Independent Physical Examination...." (Doc. 16) by February 17, 2020. Signed on February 11, 2020, by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike)
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY to Doc. #14 filed by Alan R Clark.(Davies, Cindy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for order Emergency motion to compel independent physical examination and treatment filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Having reviewed the record, Defendants request for additional time in which to address Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is granted, to and including February 17, 2020, and Plaintiffs motion for sanctions, etc. #13 is denied. Signed on Februry 11, 2020, by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (McCoy, Mike)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION for sanctions filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Defendants Earl Scott, Masonda Wheatly. Reply suggestions due by 2/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Eckenrode, J.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for sanctions with memorandum in support filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/24/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Earl Scott, Masonda Wheatly. Waiver sent to Earl Scott on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; Masonda Wheatly on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Eckenrode, J.)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Earl Scott, Masonda Wheatly (Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Earl Scott(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Masonda Wheatly(pty:dft))(Eckenrode, J.)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Alan R Clark.(Davies, Cindy)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid; (2) the Missouri Attorney General and Corizon notify the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to whether they will waive service of process, and, if so, as to which Defendants; (3) Defendants answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint within 60 days from the date of this order if service of process is waived, or within 21 days after service of process if service of process is not waived; and (4) within ten days from the date of this order, Defendants address Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the previous order denying his motion for a preliminary injunction and a temporary restraining order (Doc. #8 ). Signed on 01/17/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Willis, Kathy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for reconsideration of his motion for preliminary injunction and motion for temporary restraining (Doc. #3 ) filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/31/2020. (Willis, Kathy)
January 16, 2020 RECEIPT number KCMO082174 in the amount of $46.06 issued to Alan R. Clark. (Woods, Gloria)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and a temporary restraining order (Doc. #3 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed on January 8, 2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $46.06; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before January 21, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Alan R Clark. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for preliminary injunction and MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Alan R Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Alan R Clark. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alan R Clark. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ramey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Scott
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paliska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonda Wheatly
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Ramey
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Pliska
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan R Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?