Onkle v. Cooper County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Dereck D Onkle
Defendant: Cooper County Detention Center Medical Staff, Charen, J Lauer, Brad Simmons, Cooper County Detention Center Jail Staff and Cooper County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv04232
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this is case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous orders. (Davies, Cindy)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that this is case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous orders. Signed on January 27, 2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $1.22; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before January 21, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); (2) plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this complaint on or before January 21, 2020; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order along with complaint signature page; and (4) FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (CLERK'S NOTE: Complaint signature page mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Dereck D Onkle. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Dereck D Onkle. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Dereck D Onkle. (Davies, Cindy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dereck D Onkle. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onkle v. Cooper County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dereck D Onkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper County Detention Center Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper County Detention Center Jail Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?