Turner v. Ricoh USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Defendant: Ricoh USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04034
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Revised Proposed Scheduling Order by Ricoh USA, Inc.. (Rowe, Jack)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 7/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. See order for conference call-in numbers. Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B, Jefferson City (VDJJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 4/16/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING Teleconference held on 4/16/2020; order to issue. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Kimberly Guthrie, Michael Berry. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jack Rowe, John McDonald. Time in court: 10:30 a.m. to 10:39 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting #14 motion for protective order. Signed on 4/8/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #1 Exhibit) (Baldwin, Joella).
April 8, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/8/2020 as Document No. 18, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Exhibit attachment added and NEF regenerated. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ricoh USA, Inc.. (Rowe, Jack)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 04/02/2020 as Document No. 14-1, Exhibit. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 04/02/20 as Document No. 15, Proposed Scheduling Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jack D Rowe on behalf of Defendant Ricoh USA, Inc..(Rowe, Jack)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Rowe, Jack) Modified on 4/3/2020 Deleted Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant to Administrative Procedures (Berner, Crystal).
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for protective order Discovery Confidentiality Order filed by Jack D Rowe on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rowe, Jack) (Geiser, Angel). Modified on 4/3/2020 to delete proposed order pursuant to administrative procedures(Geiser, Angel).
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kimberly Joyce Zocher Guthrie on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Turner.(Guthrie, Kimberly)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(Rowe, Jack)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 and #10 joint motions for counsel to appear telephonically at the Case Management (Scheduling Conference) set April 16, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. The parties are asked to call: 877-336-1839; access code: 6328169 to participate in the conference. Signed on 3/25/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear Appear Telephonically at Rule 16 Conference filed by Jack D Rowe on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rowe, Jack)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for order TO PARTICIPATE IN RULE 16 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY filed by Kimberly Joyce Zocher Guthrie on behalf of Michael Turner. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Guthrie, Kimberly)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jack D Rowe on behalf of Defendant Ricoh USA, Inc..(Rowe, Jack)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc..(Rowe, Jack)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John T. McDonald for Ricoh USA, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/2/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 3/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 3/3/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jack D Rowe on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc. (Attorney Jack D Rowe added to party Ricoh USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rowe, Jack)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to allow John T. McDonald to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6754904) filed by Jennifer S. Griffin on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc.. (Griffin, Jennifer)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County County, case number 20AC-CC00036, filed by Jennifer S. Griffin on behalf of Ricoh USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6754744. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Griffin, Jennifer) (Additional attachment added on 3/3/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Regenerated NEF to all parties (Lock, Tania).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Ricoh USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Represented By: Michael G Berry
Represented By: Kimberly Joyce Zocher Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jack D Rowe
Represented By: Jennifer S. Griffin
Represented By: John T. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?