Sansonetti v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Sansonetti
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv04050
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 stipulation and joint motion to stay case. This case is stayed until July 14, 2020. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than July 15, 2020 to advise the Court of the status of the parties' settlement. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
May 19, 2020 Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2020. (View, Pat)
May 15, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to Stay and Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Case by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) Modified on 5/18/2020 to reflect correct event (Berner, Crystal).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated as counsel for Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard PeripheralVascular, Inc. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Amanda L Washington for Patrick Sansonetti allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to allow Amanda L. Washington to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6828825) filed by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attorney Chelsea E Dickerson added to party Patrick Sansonetti(pty:pla))(Dickerson, Chelsea)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6816346) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Pamela J. Marple for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to allow Pamela J. Marple to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6807942) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/15/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/30/2020. Signed on 3/31/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02153.
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2153-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16731867 filed by Patrick Sansonetti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sansonetti v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sansonetti
Represented By: Amanda L Washington
Represented By: Chelsea E Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?