Forney v. State of Missouri Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Forney
Defendant: Judge Cotton Walker and State of Missouri Department of Revenue
Case Number: 2:2020cv04053
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 SUGGESTIONS in support re #20 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of Defendant State of Missouri Department of Revenue. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Buchheit, Zachary)
June 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of State of Missouri Department of Revenue. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchheit, Zachary)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Pro se plaintiff's motion (Doc. #16 ) for extension of the deadline for the Rule 26 conference is GRANTED. The deadline for the Rule 26 conference is extended by fourteen days, to June 16, 2020. The deadline for the proposed scheduling order correspondingly is extended to June 23, 2020. The Clerk's Office shall mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. Signed on June 1, 2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) Modified on 6/2/2020 to reflect that a copy of this order has been mailed to pro se plaintiff (Lock, Tania).
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of Defendant Cotton Walker. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Buchheit, Zachary)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of Cotton Walker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchheit, Zachary)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time filed by Shirley A. Forney. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing of Suggestions in Opposition by Shirley A. Forney re #10 First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(James, Carrie)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing of Suggestions in Opposition by Shirley A. Forney re #11 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(James, Carrie)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/9/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/2/2020. Signed on 5/15/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 5/18/2020 to reflect copy mailed to Shirley Forney at 1304 West McCarty Street Apt. 207 Jefferson City, MO 65109 (Berner, Crystal).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' motions (Docs. #10 and #11 ) for fourteen-day extensions of their time to respond to the Plaintiffs' complaint are GRANTED. Defendant Judge Walker must respond to the complaint on or before May 29, 2020. Defendant Missouri Department of Revenue must respond to the complaint on or before June 1, 2020. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) Modified on 5/18/2020 to reflect copy mailed to Shirley Forney at 1304 West McCarty Street Apt. 207 Jefferson City, MO 65109 (Berner, Crystal).
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of State of Missouri Department of Revenue. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchheit, Zachary)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of Cotton Walker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchheit, Zachary)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of Cotton Walker (Attorney Zachary T. Buchheit added to party Cotton Walker(pty:dft))(Buchheit, Zachary)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Zachary T. Buchheit on behalf of State of Missouri Department of Revenue (Attorney Zachary T. Buchheit added to party State of Missouri Department of Revenue(pty:dft))(Buchheit, Zachary)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Shirley A. Forney. Cotton Walker served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Berner, Crystal)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Shirley A. Forney. State of Missouri Department of Revenue served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Berner, Crystal)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/16/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 4/16/2020, mailed to pro se plaintiff Shirley Forney at 1304 West McCarty Street, Apt 207, Jefferson City, MO 65109 (James, Carrie).
April 16, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State of Missouri Department of Revenue, Cotton Walker. (James, Carrie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a change in Judge assignment only. The case number shall now read 2:20-cv-4053-NKL. Text entry only. No document attached. Copy of notice provided to the Plaintiff. (Geiser, Angel)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/9/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (LeVasseur, Joshua) Modified on 4/13/2020 to reflect that a copy of this order was mailed to Shirley A. Forney at 1304 West McCarty Street, Apt. 207, Jefferson City, MO 65109 (Lock, Tania).
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES, AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order). Copy mailed to plaintiff. (Geiser, Angel)
April 9, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT mailed to plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Missouri Department of Revenue and Cotton Walker by Shirley A. Forney. Filing fee $400, check number 163135. Service due by 7/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Copy of docket entry mailed to plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geiser, Angel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forney v. State of Missouri Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Cotton Walker
Represented By: Zachary T. Buchheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri Department of Revenue
Represented By: Zachary T. Buchheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Forney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?