Meggs v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Mark Meggs
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv04098
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mark Meggs. United States of America served on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Service Receipts)(Votava, Brett)
June 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Woods, Gloria)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6883940. Service due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Votava, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lock, Tania).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meggs v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Meggs
Represented By: Brett Votava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?