Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Equipmentshare.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Equipmentshare.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04143
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Jefferson City Office
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 50 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-02138.
August 12, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 48 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that EquipmentShare's motion to stay this case #42 is GRANTED. This action is STAYED for all purposes pending the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on the motion to transfer in In re Ahern Rentals, Inc. "Trade Secret" Litigation, No. 2945. The parties must submit a status report within ten days of the Panel's decision, and any party may move to lift this stay once the Panel issues its decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that EquipmentShare's motion to shorten the time for determining its motion to stay #43 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Mark J. Connot re #44 Response by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #43 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Shorten Time re #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Colton D. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Supplement 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Colton D. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colton Long for Equipmentshare.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #36 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/2020. Re: #38 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #36 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Petition does not comply with Local Rule 1A 11-2(a). Certificate of Good Standing is missing from Petition. Counsel is advised to refile Petition, attaching certificate of good standing, with the Court under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #36 by May 12, 2020. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #36 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #36 Motion/Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Application is missing notary (see page 4). Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #36 . (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 36 View Corrected Image #40 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Colton Long and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5983493) by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc. (Langberg, Mitchell) Modified on 4/28/2020 (EDS). [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 34 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #33 Response by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #29 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 4/17/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/1/2020. Re #24 Motion to Defer Rule 26(f) Conference. Defendant Equipmentshare.com Inc. moved to defer the parties' Rule 26(f) conference #24 . Because it appears that the parties conducted that conference and filed their proposed discovery plan and scheduling order #31 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to defer #24 is DENIED as moot.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 31 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 30 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #29 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael E. Brewer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration Mark D. Taylor, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Complaint by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2020. (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #26 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion to Dismiss. Motions due by 3/18/2020. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint and to File Briefs in Excess of the Page Limitations re #22 Amended Complaint by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/2020. Re #16 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the filing of the amended complaint #22 , which supersedes the original complaint and moots the motion to dismiss it #16 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the original complaint #16 is DENIED without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 24 Emergency MOTION to Defer Rule 26(f) Conference by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. Responses due by 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mitchell Langberg, #2 Proposed Order) (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark J. Connot) (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equipmentshare.com, Inc. by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #16 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Stay Case. Responses due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Deadlines re #16 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Sutehall, Kevin) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #17 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael E. Brewer, #2 Declaration Mark D. Taylor, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael E. Brewer, #2 Declaration Mark D. Taylor, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. Responses due by 2/19/2020. (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/30/2020. Re #14 Motion to Enlarge Page Limit. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Excess of 24-Page Limit [ECF No. #14 ] is GRANTED. Defendant's motion may not exceed 32 pages; and in the interest of judicial economy and because defendant states that it has no objection to plaintiff having the same enlargement for its response, plaintiff's response also may not exceed 32 pages. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Emily A. Ellis) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Taylor for Equipmentshare.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Brewer for Equipmentshare.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Taylor and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5855351) by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Brewer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5855344) by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahern Rentals, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 Affidavit. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #5 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile.AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equipmentshare.com, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Don F Ahern for Ahern Rentals, Inc. added. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equipmentshare.com, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5810426) by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connot, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Equipmentshare.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Represented By: Lucy Clara Crow
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Mark J Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipmentshare.com, Inc.
Represented By: Colton Long
Represented By: Emily Anne Ellis
Represented By: Mitchell J. Langberg
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Represented By: Mark D. Taylor
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?