Doyle v. National Truckload, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cherie Doyle
Defendant: National Truckload, Inc. and Ray Elvis Hales II
Case Number: 2:2020cv04163
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for reconsideration filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Ray Elvis Hales II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hughes, Steven)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Defendant Hales' motion to dismiss or to quash service, Doc. #14 . (Sreeprakash, Netra)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #14 MOTION to quash filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant Ray Elvis Hales II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Dan Varo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Citation)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Hughes, Steven)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherie Doyle filed by Brian Tadtman on behalf of Plaintiff Cherie Doyle.(Tadtman, Brian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION to quash filed by Brian Tadtman on behalf of Plaintiff Cherie Doyle. Reply suggestions due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Tadtman, Brian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cherie Doyle. Ray Elvis Hales II served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Tadtman, Brian)
September 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 09/23/2020 as Document No. 16, Certificate of Service. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel will refile the correct document. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Vincent "Mike" Igoe(Tadtman, Brian)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Truckload, Inc. filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant National Truckload, Inc..(Hughes, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Truckload, Inc. filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant National Truckload, Inc..(Hughes, Steven) Modified on 9/24/2020 This document has been deleted as the incorrect document was attached. (Berner, Crystal).
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION to quash Service filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant Ray Elvis Hales II. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Hughes, Steven)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to quash filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Ray Elvis Hales II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Attorney Steven J. Hughes added to party Ray Elvis Hales II(pty:dft))(Hughes, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cherie Doyle. Ray Elvis Hales II served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Tadtman, Brian)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 9/10/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 9/10/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant National Truckload, Inc..(Hughes, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of Defendant National Truckload, Inc..(Hughes, Steven)
September 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ray Elvis Hales II. (Woods, Gloria)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Cherie Doyle. (Tadtman, Brian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian Tadtman on behalf of Plaintiff Cherie Doyle.(Tadtman, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 9/16/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/9/2020. Signed on 8/26/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 8/26/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of National Truckload, Inc..(Hughes, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of National Truckload, Inc. (Hughes, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Callaway County, case number 20CW-CV00111, filed by Steven J. Hughes on behalf of National Truckload, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7010911. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. National Truckload, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Truckload, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Elvis Hales II
Represented By: Steven J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Doyle
Represented By: Jason Bradford Moore
Represented By: Brian Tadtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?