Griffin v. Ramey et al
Plaintiff: David A. Griffin
Defendant: Matthew Todd, Billy Dunbar, Catherine Ousley, Myles Strid, Raina Martin, Scott Kintner, Unknown Hess, Eileen Ramey and Unknown Ozanich
Case Number: 2:2020cv04179
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); (2) plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this complaint on or before September 29, 2020; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order along with court-approved and in forma pauperis forms; and (4) FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed on September 15, 2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (CLERK'S NOTE: Court-approved and in forma pauperis forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01159.
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Pro se Letter to the Court from David Griffin re:Inmate Account (JMP) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mon Aug 31 10:49:42 CDT 2020 (Tillman, Tiffani) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Case to be transferred after 9/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/31/2020. (TMT) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Aug 27 15:02:15 CDT 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITIONER'S TRAVERSE construed as PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Billy Dunbar, Unknown Hess, Scott Kintner, Raina Martin, Catherine Ousley, Unknown Ozanich, Eileen Ramey, Myles Strid, Matthew Todd, filed by David A. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit A - D, #3 Judge Assignment Label, #4 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from moed on 9/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Ramey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Ousley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myles Strid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raina Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ozanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?