Organization for Black Struggle et al v. Ashcroft et al
Plaintiff: Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute, Organization for Black Struggle and Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Defendant: Greene County Clerk's Office, John R. Ashcroft, St. Charles County Election Authority, Jackson County Election Board and St. Louis County Board of Elections
Amicus Curiae: AARP and AARP Foundation
Case Number: 2:2020cv04184
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #71 MOTION for leave to file first amended complaint. Reply suggestions due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE re #71 MOTION for leave to file first amended complaint by John R. Ashcroft (Sauer, Dean) Modified on 11/3/2020 to reflect the correct event entry (Warren, Melissa).
October 26, 2020 Filing 79 US COURT OF APPEALS BRIEFING SCHEDULING ORDER as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by John R. Ashcroft. (Warren, Melissa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 78 USCA Judgment and/or Opinion as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by John R. Ashcroft This is a preliminary judgment and/or opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Warren, Melissa)
October 22, 2020 Filing 77 CLERK ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by John R. Ashcroft. Motion for stay pending appeal is granted. (Warren, Melissa)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Teleconference scheduled for 10/22/20 at 8:30 AM has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
October 21, 2020 Filing 76 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #63 MOTION to dismiss case and Suggestions in Support filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. Reply suggestions due by 11/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 21, 2020 Filing 75 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #73 Emergency MOTION to lift stay re 68 Order on Motion to Stay, and suggestions in support filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft. Reply suggestions due by 11/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #73 ) (Sauer, Dean)
October 21, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2020 08:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. A separate email will be sent to counsel containing the teleconference participation information.(Anderson, Christy)
October 21, 2020 Filing 73 Emergency MOTION to lift stay re 68 Order on Motion to Stay, and suggestions in support filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 19, 2020 Filing 72 SUGGESTIONS in support re #71 MOTION for leave to file first amended complaint filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Related document(s) #71 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 19, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to file first amended complaint filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Organization for Black Struggle. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 proposed amended complaint)(Rothert, Anthony)
October 13, 2020 Filing 70 USCA Case Number from Eighth Circuit is 20-3121 for #66 Notice of Appeal filed by John R. Ashcroft. (Warren, Melissa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 69 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #66 Notice of Appeal. (Warren, Melissa)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDERED the motion for temporary administrative stay (Doc. #67) is GRANTED. The preliminary injunction order (Doc. #65) is temporarily administratively stayed pending ruling on appeal by the Eighth Circuit. (Doc. #66).Signed on 10/10/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
October 9, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to stay re #65 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO Missouri Secretary of State's Emergency Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal and for Temporary Administrative Stay filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Sauer, Dean)
October 9, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #65 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO by John R. Ashcroft. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOWDC-7089280. (Sauer, Dean) Modified on 10/15/2020 to reflect interlocutory appeal (Warren, Melissa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for preliminary injunction; granting in part and denying in part #23 motion for TRO. Signed on 10/9/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Kern, Kendra)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #41 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ryan Snow for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
October 8, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to dismiss case and Suggestions in Support filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Greene County Clerk's Office. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - GRANTING #58 motion for leave to file excess pages. Plaintiff's are granted leave to file their Reply Suggestions in excess of the page limit, re. motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed on 10/8/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of appearance by Jessie Steffan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Missouri Faith Voices(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Organization for Black Struggle(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla))(Steffan, Jessie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM under Rules 12(b)(1) and Suggestions in Support filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. Reply suggestions due by 10/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #56 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 6, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 proposed reply to suggestions in opposition to motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, #2 Ex. A to proposed reply to suggestions in opposition to motion for TRO/PI)(Rothert, Anthony)
October 6, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to certify class defendant class of Missouri local election authorities or in the alternate joinder of all Missouri local election authorities filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
October 2, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM under Rules 12(b)(1) and Suggestions in Support filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sauer, Dean)
October 2, 2020 Filing 55 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Defendant Greene County Clerk's Office. Reply suggestions due by 10/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Fax, Nicholas)
October 2, 2020 Filing 54 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction Suggestions of Amici Curiae AARP and AARP Foundation in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuction filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of Amicus Parties AARP, AARP Foundation. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Hatfield, Charles)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Daniel B Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 52 Motion to allow Daniel B. Kohrman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7075541) filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of AARP, AARP Foundation. (Hatfield, Charles)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Doc. #43) is GRANTED. Further, Amici Curiae's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Doc. #50) is GRANTED. Signed on 10/2/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
October 1, 2020 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages , MOTION for leave to file Suggestions of Amici Curiae AARP and AARP Foundation in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Suggestions in Support of Motion for Leave and Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Two Pages filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of AARP, AARP Foundation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suggestions of Amici Curiae AARP and AARP Foundation in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Attorney Charles W. Hatfield added to party AARP(pty:am), Attorney Charles W. Hatfield added to party AARP Foundation(pty:am))(Hatfield, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Filing 49 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to certify class defendant class of Missouri local election authorities or in the alternate joinder of all Missouri local election authorities filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of filing Attachments to Declaration of Chrissy Peters and Exhibits to Missouri Secretary of State's Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John R. Ashcroft re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 32, #2 Exhibit Attachment 33, #3 Exhibit Attachment 38, #4 Exhibit Attachment 39, #5 Exhibit Attachment 40, #6 Exhibit Attachment 41, #7 Exhibit Attachment 42 - Part 1, #8 Exhibit Attachment 42 - Part 2, #9 Exhibit Attachment 43, #10 Exhibit Attachment 44, #11 Exhibit Attachment 45, #12 Exhibit Attachment 46, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eric Fey, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Exhibit of Shane Schoeller)(Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of filing Exhibits to Chrissy Peters Declaration by John R. Ashcroft re #27 Suggestions in Support of Motion,,,,,, #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 16, #2 Exhibit Attachment 17, #3 Exhibit Attachment 18, #4 Exhibit Attachment 21, #5 Exhibit Attachment 22, #6 Exhibit Attachment 23, #7 Exhibit Attachment 24, #8 Exhibit Attachment 24, #9 Exhibit Attachment 25, #10 Exhibit Attachment 26, #11 Exhibit Attachment 27, #12 Exhibit Attachment 28, #13 Exhibit Attachment 29, #14 Exhibit Attachment 30)(Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 46 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Chrissy Peters, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2, #4 Exhibit Attachment 3, #5 Exhibit Attachment 6, #6 Exhibit Attachment 7, #7 Exhibit Attachment 8, #8 Exhibit Attachment 9, #9 Exhibit Attachment 10, #10 Exhibit Attachment 11, #11 Exhibit Attachment 12, #12 Exhibit Attachment 13, #13 Exhibit Attachment 14, #14 Exhibit Attachment 15)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 45 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to certify class defendant class of Missouri local election authorities or in the alternate joinder of all Missouri local election authorities filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Defendant Greene County Clerk's Office. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Fax, Nicholas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of filing Defendant Missouri Secretary of State's Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John R. Ashcroft re #27 Suggestions in Support of Motion,,,,,, #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction (Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to file excess pages in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Defendant Class filed by Dean John Sauer on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sauer, Dean)
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Steven W. Garrett on behalf of Defendant St. Louis County Board of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Fey)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Garrett, Steven)
October 1, 2020 Filing 41 Motion to allow Ryan Snow to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7073722) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of appearance by John W. Housley on behalf of Greene County Clerk's Office (Attorney John W. Housley added to party Greene County Clerk's Office(pty:dft))(Housley, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Greene County Clerk's Office (Attorney Nicholas Austin Fax added to party Greene County Clerk's Office(pty:dft))(Fax, Nicholas)
September 24, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of appearance by Edward J. Sluys on behalf of St. Louis County Board of Elections (Attorney Edward J. Sluys added to party St. Louis County Board of Elections(pty:dft))(Sluys, Edward)
September 24, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of appearance by Steven W. Garrett on behalf of St. Louis County Board of Elections (Attorney Steven W. Garrett added to party St. Louis County Board of Elections(pty:dft))(Garrett, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of appearance by Julie Marie Blake on behalf of John R. Ashcroft (Attorney Julie Marie Blake added to party John R. Ashcroft(pty:dft))(Blake, Julie)
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Organization for Black Struggle. Greene County Clerk's Office served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Denise Debra Lieberman for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 22, 2020 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Organization for Black Struggle. St. Louis County Board of Elections served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to allow Denise D. Lieberman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7057983) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 22, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 22, 2020 Filing 30 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Organization for Black Struggle. Jackson County Election Board served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 22, 2020 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Organization for Black Struggle. St. Charles County Election Authority served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 21, 2020 Filing 28 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to certify class defendant class of Missouri local election authorities or in the alternate joinder of all Missouri local election authorities filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Rogers Declaration (Organization for Black Struggle), #2 Exhibit B: Robinson Declaration (St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute), #3 Exhibit C: Jones Declaration (Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute), #4 Exhibit D: Alper Declaration (National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section), #5 Exhibit E: Gould Declaration (Missouri Faith Voices), #6 Exhibit F: Lohman Declaration, #7 Exhibit G: Francis Declaration, #8 Exhibit H: Huddleston Declaration, #9 Exhibit I: Jordan Declaration, #10 Exhibit J: Marek Declaration, #11 Exhibit K: Orden Zarin Declaration, #12 Exhibit L: Stenger Declaration, #13 Exhibit M: Washington Declaration, #14 Exhibit N: Gaither Declaration, #15 Exhibit O: Marantz Declaration, #16 Exhibit P: Morgan Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q: Newman Declaration, #18 Exhibit R: NYT - Covid in the US, #19 Exhibit S: NYT Missouri Covid Map, #20 Exhibit T: Memorandum on November Absentee Applications (Aug. 26, 2020), #21 Exhibit U: Ballot Application Rejection Example, #22 Exhibit V: USPS Letter, #23 Exhibit W: Ballot Affidavit Images, #24 Index Index of Exhibits to Suggestions in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Teleconference set for 9/24/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. A separate email will be sent to counsel containing the teleconference participation information.(Anderson, Christy)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file excess pages (Docs. #8, #24) are GRANTED. Signed on 9/21/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
September 19, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 proposed suggestions in support of TRO/PI, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J, #11 Ex. K, #12 Ex. L, #13 Ex. M, #14 Ex. N, #15 Ex. O, #16 Ex. P, #17 Ex. Q, #18 Ex. R, #19 Ex. S, #20 Ex. T, #21 Ex. U, #22 Ex. V, #23 Ex. W, #24 List of Exhibits)(Rothert, Anthony)
September 19, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of appearance by Dean John Sauer on behalf of John R. Ashcroft (Attorney Dean John Sauer added to party John R. Ashcroft(pty:dft))(Sauer, Dean)
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of appearance by Kayla DeLoach on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Kayla DeLoach added to party Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Kayla DeLoach added to party Missouri Faith Voices(pty:pla), Attorney Kayla DeLoach added to party National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section(pty:pla), Attorney Kayla DeLoach added to party Organization for Black Struggle(pty:pla), Attorney Kayla DeLoach added to party St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla))(DeLoach, Kayla)
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. John R. Ashcroft served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Chiraag Bains for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to allow Chiraag Bains to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7052794) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ezra D. Rosenberg for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to allow Ezra D. Rosenberg to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7052017) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Naila S Awan for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kathryn Sadasivan for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Missouri Faith Voices, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John R. Ashcroft, Greene County Clerk's Office, Jackson County Election Board, St. Charles County Election Authority, and St. Louis County Board of Elections. Summons emailed to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Missouri Faith Voices(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Organization for Black Struggle(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla))(Wilcox, Gillian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. The case number will now be 2:20-04184-CV-C-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (James, Carrie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Organization for Black Struggle.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 proposed suggestions in support for motion to certify defendant class of missouri local election authorities or in the alternate for joinder of all missouri local election authorities)(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Naila S. Awan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7051123) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to certify class defendant class of Missouri local election authorities or in the alternate joinder of all Missouri local election authorities filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to allow Kathryn Sadasivan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7051058) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Missouri Faith Voices.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John R. Ashcroft, Greene County Clerk's Office, Jackson County Election Board, St. Charles County Election Authority, St. Louis County Board of Elections filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute, National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section, Organization for Black Struggle, Missouri Faith Voices. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7050737. Service due by 12/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothert, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organization for Black Struggle et al v. Ashcroft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Clerk's Office
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Represented By: John W. Housley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Ashcroft
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Election Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Election Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Board of Elections
Represented By: Steven W. Garrett
Represented By: Edward J. Sluys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Faith Voices
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S Awan
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Council of Jewish Women St. Louis Section
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S Awan
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S Awan
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organization for Black Struggle
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S Awan
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Naila S Awan
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Kathryn Sadasivan
Represented By: Denise Debra Lieberman
Represented By: Jessie Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Daniel B Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP Foundation
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Daniel B Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?