O'Neal v. Gehlert et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. O'Neal
Defendant: Kenneth Gehlert, Eric Southard and Robert Pursel
Case Number: 2:2020cv04191
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has neither submitted a non-prisoner affidavit of poverty, nor paid to the Clerk of Court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, a check or money order in the amount of $400 for the filing fee in this case as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before November 23, 2020 as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed on 11/12/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff either submit a non-prisoner affidavit of poverty or pay to the Clerk of the Court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, a check or money order in the amount of $400.00 for the filing fee in this case on or before November 4, 2020, or this case will be dismissed without further notice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed on 10/14/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (CLERK'S NOTE: A non-prisoner affidavit of poverty and this Order were mailed to Plaintiff.) (Willis, Kathy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Jeffrey J. O'Neal. (Davies, Cindy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffrey J. O'Neal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits) (CLERK'S NOTE: a DVD from Moberly Diagnostics was included with the complaint and will be maintained in the Prisoner Pro Se office.)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Gehlert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gehlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pursel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?