United States of America v. Sota Arms Inc. SA15 Pistol CAL: Multi SN:007640 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) Hellcat Pistol CAL:9 SN:AT263662, Weatherby Vanguard Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:VS401726, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:1955-08119, Ruger Super Redhawk Revolver CAL:44 SN:551-85507, Savage 11 Rifle CAL:243 SN:6096351, Remington Arms Company 33 Rifle CAL:22 SN: Unknown, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:286553, Norinco (North China Industries) SKS Rifle CAL:762 SN:11362867, Savage 416 Rifle CAL:22 SN:204048, Sauer J.P. (Sauer & Sohn) Unknown Unknown CAL: Unknown SN:363925, Stoeger M3K Shotgun CAL:12 SN:1363372, Essential Arms Inc J15-F Rifle CAL:223 SN:E.A.59581, Kimber PRO Crimson Carry II Pistol SN:KR186937, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30 SN:1359571, Springfield Armory, Geneseo, IL M1A Rifle CAL:762 SN:308519, Harrington and Richardson 176 Shotgun CAL:10 SN:AS253297, Spike's Tactical LLC SL15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:SAR35875, Wilson Combat Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:WCC11876, Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P238 Pistol CAL:380 SN:27A037833, Smith & Wesson 629 Revolver CAL:44 SN:BJH3128, Smith & Wesson Victory Revolver CAL:38 SN:334821, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:4-003318, Smith & Wesson Victory Revolver CAL:38 SN:133100, Johnson Automatics, Inc 1941 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:B6502, Mosin-Nagant Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:523721, Aero Precision X15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:AR29697, Savage 11 Rifle CAL:308 SN:G205941, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:1180301, Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC ML-45 Pistol CAL: Unknown SN:KS45-00713, Russian Unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:V4182, LWRC (Leitner Wise Rifle Co. Inc.) M6 Rifle CAL:556 SN:03-01157, HS Product (IM Metal) XDM Pistol CAL:9 SN:MG702307, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:37435, Smith & Wesson unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:C275255, Romarm/Cugir PSL-54C Rifle CAL:762 SN:F-2995-77, Sota Arms Inc. SA15 Pistol CAL: Multi SN:007640, Ruger LCP Pistol CAL:380 SN:371536469, Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P938 Pistol CAL:9 SN:52B191648, Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P226 Pistol CAL:9 SN:UU651506, Colt 1911 Pistol CAL: 45 SN:95719, Lithgow 1941 Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:57858, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) STI Spartan Pistol CAL:45 SN:S004156, HS Product (IM Metal) XDS Pistol SN:S3822809, Mossberg 44 Rifle CAL:22 SN:143424, HS Product (IM Metal) XDM Pistol CAL:9 SN:MG0709149, CMMG INC. MK47 Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:KWT00245, Savage 110 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:F006872, Savage 111 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:G445863, Remington Arms Company, Inc. Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:3290208, Romarm/Cugir WASR-2 Rifle CAL:545 SN:2-200230-9, Romarm/Cugir GP WASR 10/63 Rifle CAL:762 SN:1970BU4307, F.N. (FN Herstal) Unknown Shotgun CAL:12 SN:12AZX10383, Coonan Inc. Blaine, MN Classic Pistol CAL:357 SN:DCDSA1, Spike's Tactical LLC ST15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:KA101872, Oviedo Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:01-40569, North American Arms Unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:L198168, Smith & Wesson 1000 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:FB52468, Advanced Armament Corp of Georgia MPW Rifle CAL:300 SN:BLK03006, Remington Arms Company Inc. 1911 Pistol CAL:45 SN:960984, Yankee Hill Machine Co. Inc. YHM-15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:YH012256, Mosin-Nagant Unknown Rifle CAL:762 SN:494, Romania M56 Rifle CAL:762 SN:RA5052-1960, Remington Arms Company, Inc. Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:3501459, F-1 Firearms LLC Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:110-01002, Benelli S. PA. M2 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:M767767R, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:4313648, Wesson Arms, Dan CCO Bobtail Pistol CAL:45 SN:1501853, Spike's Tactical LLC Crusader Pistol CAL: Unknown SN:DV-013897, POF USA (Patriot Ordnance Factory) P-415 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:BB-1605165, Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30 SN:2208550 and HS Product (IM Metal) Hellcat Pistol CAL:9 SN:AT234926
Case Number: 2:2021cv04063
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to All Defendants. All Defendants served on 4/5/2021. (Nguyen, Nhan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Scott Hamlin by United States of America (Nguyen, Nhan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Amanda Hamlin by United States of America (Nguyen, Nhan)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 03/29/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by Nhan D Nguyen on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 6/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nguyen, Nhan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sota Arms Inc. SA15 Pistol CAL: Multi SN:007640 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) Hellcat Pistol CAL:9 SN:AT263662
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherby Vanguard Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:VS401726
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:1955-08119
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger Super Redhawk Revolver CAL:44 SN:551-85507
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 11 Rifle CAL:243 SN:6096351
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company 33 Rifle CAL:22 SN: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:286553
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norinco (North China Industries) SKS Rifle CAL:762 SN:11362867
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 416 Rifle CAL:22 SN:204048
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauer J.P. (Sauer & Sohn) Unknown Unknown CAL: Unknown SN:363925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoeger M3K Shotgun CAL:12 SN:1363372
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essential Arms Inc J15-F Rifle CAL:223 SN:E.A.59581
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimber PRO Crimson Carry II Pistol SN:KR186937
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30 SN:1359571
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Armory, Geneseo, IL M1A Rifle CAL:762 SN:308519
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington and Richardson 176 Shotgun CAL:10 SN:AS253297
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike's Tactical LLC SL15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:SAR35875
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Combat Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:WCC11876
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P238 Pistol CAL:380 SN:27A037833
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson 629 Revolver CAL:44 SN:BJH3128
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Victory Revolver CAL:38 SN:334821
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:4-003318
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Victory Revolver CAL:38 SN:133100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Automatics, Inc 1941 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:B6502
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosin-Nagant Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:523721
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Precision X15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:AR29697
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 11 Rifle CAL:308 SN:G205941
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:1180301
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC ML-45 Pistol CAL: Unknown SN:KS45-00713
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russian Unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:V4182
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LWRC (Leitner Wise Rifle Co. Inc.) M6 Rifle CAL:556 SN:03-01157
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) XDM Pistol CAL:9 SN:MG702307
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:37435
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:C275255
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romarm/Cugir PSL-54C Rifle CAL:762 SN:F-2995-77
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sota Arms Inc. SA15 Pistol CAL: Multi SN:007640
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger LCP Pistol CAL:380 SN:371536469
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P938 Pistol CAL:9 SN:52B191648
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer (Sig-Arms) P226 Pistol CAL:9 SN:UU651506
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt 1911 Pistol CAL: 45 SN:95719
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithgow 1941 Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:57858
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) STI Spartan Pistol CAL:45 SN:S004156
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) XDS Pistol SN:S3822809
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossberg 44 Rifle CAL:22 SN:143424
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) XDM Pistol CAL:9 SN:MG0709149
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMMG INC. MK47 Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:KWT00245
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 110 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:F006872
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 111 Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:G445863
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, Inc. Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:3290208
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romarm/Cugir WASR-2 Rifle CAL:545 SN:2-200230-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romarm/Cugir GP WASR 10/63 Rifle CAL:762 SN:1970BU4307
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) Unknown Shotgun CAL:12 SN:12AZX10383
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coonan Inc. Blaine, MN Classic Pistol CAL:357 SN:DCDSA1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike's Tactical LLC ST15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:KA101872
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oviedo Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:01-40569
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Arms Unknown Revolver CAL: Unknown SN:L198168
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson 1000 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:FB52468
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Armament Corp of Georgia MPW Rifle CAL:300 SN:BLK03006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company Inc. 1911 Pistol CAL:45 SN:960984
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yankee Hill Machine Co. Inc. YHM-15 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:YH012256
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosin-Nagant Unknown Rifle CAL:762 SN:494
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romania M56 Rifle CAL:762 SN:RA5052-1960
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, Inc. Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:3501459
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F-1 Firearms LLC Unknown Rifle CAL: Unknown SN:110-01002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benelli S. PA. M2 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:M767767R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30-06 SN:4313648
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesson Arms, Dan CCO Bobtail Pistol CAL:45 SN:1501853
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike's Tactical LLC Crusader Pistol CAL: Unknown SN:DV-013897
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POF USA (Patriot Ordnance Factory) P-415 Rifle CAL: Multi SN:BB-1605165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturer Unknown Rifle CAL:30 SN:2208550
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Product (IM Metal) Hellcat Pistol CAL:9 SN:AT234926
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nhan D Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?