State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Omni Alliance, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance a/a/o Piyusha Singh and Justus Sackett and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Omni Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04122
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - File stamped complaint to Def, #2 Exhibit B - Follow-up email to Def, #3 Exhibit C - Additional follow-up email to Def, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Lawsuit, #5 Exhibit E - Waiver of Service, #6 Exhibit F - Return of Due Dilegence)(McArthur, Matthew)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Nanette L. Laughrey. Service on Defendant Omni Alliance, Inc., was due July 31, 2021. Doc. #3 . To date, Plaintiff has not provided proof of service on Defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by August 13, 2021, why it has not obtained service on Defendant. In lieu of responding to this Show Cause Order, Plaintiff may file proof of service on Defendant by August 13, 2021. If Plaintiff does not provide proof of service or respond to this Show Cause Order, the Court may dismiss all claims against Defendant without prejudice. Signed on 8/2/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omni Alliance, Inc. Summons directed to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 06/21/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omni Alliance, Inc. filed by Matthew M. McArthur on behalf of State Farm Insurance a/a/o Piyusha Singh and Justus Sackett. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7459810. Service due by 9/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McArthur, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Omni Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance a/a/o Piyusha Singh and Justus Sackett
Represented By: Matthew M. McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew M. McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?