Carroll et al v. Brunswick Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Karen Carroll, Honor Carroll, Trace Carroll and The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats and Brunswick Boat Group
Case Number: 2:2021cv04136
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Philip V. Sumner on behalf of Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats (Attorney Philip V. Sumner added to party Brunswick Boat Group(pty:dft), Attorney Philip V. Sumner added to party Brunswick Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Philip V. Sumner added to party Sea Ray Boats(pty:dft))(Sumner, Philip)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats.(Roper, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats (Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party Brunswick Boat Group(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party Brunswick Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party Sea Ray Boats(pty:dft))(Roper, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Brunswick Boat Group served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021; Brunswick Corporation served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021; Sea Ray Boats served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Served Brunswick Boat, #2 Summons Served Sea Ray)(Wilbers, John) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/5/2021 to reflect order of pages) (Warren, Melissa).
July 30, 2021 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats; emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Berner, Crystal)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Brunswick Boat Group served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021; Sea Ray Boats served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Served Sea Ray)(Wilbers, John) Modified on 7/27/2021 to reflect correct service and answer due dates. NEF regenerated (Warren, Melissa).
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Brunswick Corporation served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Wilbers, John) Modified on 7/26/2021 reflect correct service and answer due date. NEF regenerated (Warren, Melissa).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Laurence Tien for Honor Carroll, Karen Carroll, Trace Carroll and for The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Aaron Heckaman for Honor Carroll, Karen Carroll, Trace Carroll and for The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to allow Laurence Tien to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7503544) filed by John L. B. Wilbers on behalf of Honor Carroll, Karen Carroll, Trace Carroll, The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll. (Wilbers, John)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow Aaron Heckaman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7503539) filed by John L. B. Wilbers on behalf of Honor Carroll, Karen Carroll, Trace Carroll, The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll. (Wilbers, John)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Robert W. Cowan #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to allow Robert W. Cowan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7501878) filed by John L. Wilbers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attorney Robert W. Cowan added to party Honor Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Cowan added to party Karen Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Cowan added to party Trace Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Cowan added to party The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll(pty:pla))(Cowan, Robert) Modified on 7/20/2021 to reflect sponsoring attorney (Berner, Crystal).
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 07/16/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats Inc filed by John L. B. Wilbers on behalf of The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll, Karen Carroll, Trace Carroll, Honor Carroll. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7498118. Service due by 10/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilbers, John)
July 16, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brunswick Boat Group, Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats. Summons returned to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll et al v. Brunswick Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Carroll
Represented By: John L. B. Wilbers
Represented By: Aaron Heckaman
Represented By: Laurence Tien
Represented By: Robert W. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honor Carroll
Represented By: John L. B. Wilbers
Represented By: Aaron Heckaman
Represented By: Laurence Tien
Represented By: Robert W. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trace Carroll
Represented By: John L. B. Wilbers
Represented By: Aaron Heckaman
Represented By: Laurence Tien
Represented By: Robert W. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Shawn E. Carroll
Represented By: John L. B. Wilbers
Represented By: Aaron Heckaman
Represented By: Laurence Tien
Represented By: Robert W. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Philip V. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Ray Boats
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Philip V. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Boat Group
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Philip V. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?