Mangels v. Twinings North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Mangels
Defendant: Twinings North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04138
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 14, 2021 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jack Bangert(Dollar, Tim)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Doc. #27 , is granted. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss, Doc. #25 , is now September 28, 2021. Signed on 09/08/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #26 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Patricia Mangels. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Dollar, Tim)
September 7, 2021 Filing 26 SUGGESTIONS in support re #25 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Defendant Twinings North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Ryan, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Twinings North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ryan, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Dollar, Tim)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Parties' motion for leave to file excess pages, Doc. #22 , is granted. Defendant's suggestions in support of its upcoming motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition may not exceed 25 pages. Signed on 09/07/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ryan, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Mangels.(Dollar, Tim)
August 25, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Defendant Twinings North America, Inc..(Ryan, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Sean H Suber for Twinings North America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 18 Motion to allow Sean H. Suber to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7548976) filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Twinings North America, Inc.. (Ryan, Andrew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Daniel Blouin for Twinings North America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 Motion to allow Daniel Blouin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7548318) filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Twinings North America, Inc. (Ryan, Andrew)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Joshua Nassir for Patricia Mangels allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to allow Joshua Nassir to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7541765) filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Patricia Mangels. (Dollar, Tim)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 and #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Benjamin Heikali and Timothy J Peter for Patricia Mangels allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to allow Timothy J. Peter to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7541698) filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Patricia Mangels. (Dollar, Tim)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Benjamin Heikali to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7541682) filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Patricia Mangels. (Dollar, Tim)
August 18, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendant's motion for extension of time, Doc. #8 , is granted. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, Doc #1 , is now September 7, 2021. Signed on 8/17/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed scheduling order due by 9/7/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 8/31/2021. Signed on 08/17/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Twinings North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ryan, Andrew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Twinings North America, Inc. (Attorney Andrew D Ryan added to party Twinings North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ryan, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 08/04/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This case number shall now read 2:21-cv-04138-NKL. (Berner, Crystal)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Patricia Mangels. Twinings North America, Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Dollar, Tim)
July 21, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Twinings North America, Inc.; emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Berner, Crystal)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/19/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Karp, Beth)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7500328. Service due by 10/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Dollar, Tim)
July 19, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangels v. Twinings North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mangels
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Timothy J Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinings North America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Ryan
Represented By: Daniel M Blouin
Represented By: Sean H Suber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?