Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Concrete Strategies, LLC
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Albert Bond, Donald E Greenwell, III, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Virgil Kloth, Brian Murphy, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis and St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Defendant: Concrete Strategies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04148
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants unopposed motion to amend the scheduling order to change the trial date #17 is GRANTED. The bench trial shall commence on September 19, 2022.Signed on 09/15/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to amend/correct #15 Scheduling Order, Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Bench Trial Order [Doc. 15] and Continue Trial Setting filed by Matthew Robinson on behalf of Concrete Strategies, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Robinson, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 08/30/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/25/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Bench Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2022. Signed on 08/30/21 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Donald E Greenwell, III, Virgil Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council. (Schuster, Aaron)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Concrete Strategies, LLC.(Martone, Andrew)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Andrew John Martone on behalf of Defendant Concrete Strategies, LLC.(Martone, Andrew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Andrew John Martone on behalf of Defendant Concrete Strategies, LLC.(Martone, Andrew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Aaron Schuster on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Donald E Greenwell, III, Virgil Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council.(Schuster, Aaron)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Plaintiff. Concrete Strategies, LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021 (Schuster, Aaron) Modified on 8/12/2021 to reflect service and answer due dates. NEF regenerated (Warren, Melissa).
August 12, 2021 ***Concrete Strategies, LLC answer due 8/24/2021. (Warren, Melissa)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Settlement Conference set for video teleconference 11/18/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representative's approval is required to settle, they must attend. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement, of no more than three (3) pages, to angel_geiser@mow.uscourts.gov at least three (3) business days prior to the mediation. Video Teleconference link will be provided to the parties by email. For the public or media to request court hearing audio access, please email mow_help@mow.uscourts.gov. (Geiser, Angel)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed scheduling order due by 8/26/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 8/19/2021. Signed on 08/05/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Gilbert B Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Gilbert B Williams added to party Concrete Strategies, LLC(pty:dft))(Williams, Gilbert)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Matthew Robinson added to party Concrete Strategies, LLC(pty:dft))(Robinson, Matthew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew John Martone on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Andrew John Martone added to party Concrete Strategies, LLC(pty:dft))(Martone, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 07/30/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Aaron Schuster on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7515162. Service due by 10/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuster, Aaron)
July 29, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concrete Strategies, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Concrete Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bond
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Kloth
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Murphy
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concrete Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Martone
Represented By: Gilbert B Williams
Represented By: Matthew Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?