Villarreal v. Bayer U.S. LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Villarreal, Jeremy Wyant, Mike Poovey, Sean Steinwedel, Jonathan Martin, Don Penales, Jr. and Christopher Cadorette
Defendant: Bayer U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04221
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - GRANTING #17 parties' Joint Motion to Coordinate Briefing Schedule and for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant's response to the amended complaint shall be due 30 days after the Court rules on the pending first-filed motion. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall be filed no later than 45 days after the Court rules on the first-filed motion. The Scheduling Teleconference set for February 9, 2022 is CONTINUED, and will be reset at a later date by the Court. Based on the relief requested and granted in the instant joint motion, #5 Defendant's Motion for extension of time to respond to the amended complaint, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 1/11/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
January 11, 2022 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Scheduling Teleconference scheduled for 2/9/2022 09:30 AM has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Coordinate Briefing and Extend Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Christopher Cadorette, Jonathan Martin, Don Penales, Jr., Mike Poovey, Sean Steinwedel, Jose Villarreal, Jeremy Wyant. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dollar, Tim)
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION to dismiss case in Favor of First-Filed Class Action filed by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Huertas Complaint)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Hohn, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss case in Favor of First-Filed Class Action filed by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hohn, Christopher)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Henry Liu for Bayer U.S. LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 13 Motion to allow Henry Liu to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7732035) filed by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC. (Hohn, Christopher)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - GRANTING #10 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time and to set briefing schedule. It is ORDERED Defendant is to file any motion under the first-filed rule on or before January 4, 2022. Plaintiff's response to the motion shall be due by January 25, 2022, and Defendant's reply shall be due by February 8, 2022. It is further ORDERED Plaintiffs response to Defendant's motion for extension (Doc. #5 ) is due by January 6, 2022. It is further ORDERED Defendant is granted a limited extension of time to file its response to the amended complaint until Defendant's motion for extension (Doc. #5 ) is fully briefed and the Court has ruled on the motion. The Court will set the Defendant's response deadline accordingly at the time the Court rules on said motion. Signed on 12/22/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
December 22, 2021 Utility/Set Deadlines: Motion due by 1/4/2022. Suggestions in opposition/response due on or before 1/25/2022 unless otherwise directed by the Court. Reply suggestions due on or before 2/8/2022 unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Anderson, Christy)
December 20, 2021 Bayer U.S. LLC answer due 12/21/2021. (Berner, Crystal)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Christopher Cadorette, Jonathan Martin, Don Penales, Jr., Mike Poovey, Sean Steinwedel, Jose Villarreal, Jeremy Wyant. Bayer, U.S., LLC served on 11/30/2021, Answer due 12/21/2021. (Related document(s)[]) (Dollar, Tim) Modified on 12/21/2021 to correct event type and set answer deadlines. NEF regenerated (Berner, Crystal).
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #5 MOTION for extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint (Unopposed) and to Set Briefing Schedule filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Dollar, Tim)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Bayer U.S. LLC filed by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC.(Hohn, Christopher)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/26/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 1/12/2022. Scheduling Teleconference set for 2/9/2022 09:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 12/15/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC (Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bayer U.S. LLC(pty:dft))(Sanocki, Kristen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Booker T Shaw on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC (Attorney Booker T Shaw added to party Bayer U.S. LLC(pty:dft))(Shaw, Booker)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint filed by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hohn, Christopher)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer U.S. LLC (Attorney Christopher M. Hohn added to party Bayer U.S. LLC(pty:dft))(Hohn, Christopher)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bayer U.S. LLC filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Dollar, Tim)
November 23, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer U.S. LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer U.S. LLC filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Jose Villarreal. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7676506. Service due by 2/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dollar, Tim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villarreal v. Bayer U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Villarreal
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wyant
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Poovey
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Steinwedel
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Martin
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Penales, Jr.
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cadorette
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer U.S. LLC
Represented By: Booker T Shaw
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?