Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. GKD Management, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Defendant: GKD Management, L.P. An Arizona Limited Partnership doing business as GKD Investments doing business as A&G Commercial Trucking and A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04225
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/9/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 2/2/2022. Signed on 01/19/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc., GKD Management, L.P..(Harrison, Thomas)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas M. Harrison on behalf of A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc., GKD Management, L.P. (Attorney Thomas M. Harrison added to party A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Harrison added to party GKD Management, L.P.(pty:dft))(Harrison, Thomas)
January 18, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/14/2022 as Document No. 8 and 9, return of service. The documents has been deleted as it was a duplicate filing of documents #10 and #11 . This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 17, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Durso, Christopher) Modified on 1/18/2022 to reflect service and answer due date (Warren, Melissa).
January 17, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. GKD Management, L.P. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Durso, Christopher) Modified on 1/18/2022 to reflect service and answer due dates. (Warren, Melissa).
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 This document has been deleted. RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Chinitz, Ross)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 This document has been deleted. RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. GKD Management, L.P. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Chinitz, Ross)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. On November 29, 2021, the Court ordered Plaintiff to obtain service on all defendants within 40 days. Doc. #3 . That deadline has since passed, and to date, no proof of service has been filed. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, on or before January 28, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to timely effect service. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ross M. Chinitz for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to allow Ross M. Chintz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7692323) filed by Christopher K. Durso on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Durso, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS PURSUANT TO L.R 7.1 AND F.R.C.P. 7.1 filed by Christopher K. Durso on behalf of Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Durso, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 11/29/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher K. Durso on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7689143. Service due by 2/28/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durso, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc. and GKD Management, L.P. Summons forwarded to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. GKD Management, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Christopher K. Durso
Represented By: Ross Chinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKD Management, L.P. An Arizona Limited Partnership doing business as GKD Investments doing business as A&G Commercial Trucking
Represented By: Thomas M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & G Commercial Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?