Oaker v. Skiles et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Oaker
Defendant: Christopher Skiles, Michael Couty, Cole County Missouri, John Doe and Kathy Lloyd
Case Number: 2:2021cv04242
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 28 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #21 MOTION to join Cole County's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William P. Nacy on behalf of Plaintiff Beverly Oaker. Reply suggestions due by 3/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Nacy, William)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #25 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #21 MOTION to join Cole County's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/23/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
February 23, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William C.J. Walker on behalf of Defendant Kathy Lloyd. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Walker, William)
February 23, 2022 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #21 MOTION to join Cole County's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William P. Nacy on behalf of Beverly Oaker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Nacy, William)
February 23, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Defendants Cole County Missouri, Michael Couty. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Heigele, Christopher)
February 9, 2022 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William P. Nacy on behalf of Plaintiff Beverly Oaker. Reply suggestions due by 2/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Nacy, William)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Notice of Change of Firm Name by Cole County Missouri, Michael Couty (Heigele, Christopher)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to join Cole County's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Michael Couty. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heigele, Christopher)
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Michael Couty.(Heigele, Christopher)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #18 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/7/2022 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Maerz, Mary)
February 7, 2022 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William P. Nacy on behalf of Beverly Oaker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Nacy, William)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Michael Couty answer due 2/7/2022.. Signed on 1/28/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Michael Couty. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heigele, Christopher)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Jacob Donald Bielenberg on behalf of Cole County Missouri, Michael Couty (Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Cole County Missouri (pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Donald Bielenberg added to party Michael Couty(pty:dft))(Bielenberg, Jacob)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Michael Couty (Attorney Christopher L. Heigele added to party Michael Couty(pty:dft))(Heigele, Christopher)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Bretton Kreifel terminated as counsel for defendant Cole County. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (KBR)
January 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Bretton William Hake Kreifel on behalf of Cole County Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kreifel, Bretton) (Main Document 12 replaced at the request of filer on 1/24/2022 and NEF regenerated) (Siegert, Karen).
January 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Cole County Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heigele, Christopher)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William P. Nacy on behalf of Plaintiff Beverly Oaker. Reply suggestions due by 2/2/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Nacy, William)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William C.J. Walker on behalf of Kathy Lloyd. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Walker, William)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by William C.J. Walker on behalf of Kathy Lloyd (Walker, William)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/15/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 2/28/2022. Signed on 1/4/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Bretton William Hake Kreifel on behalf of Cole County Missouri (Attorney Bretton William Hake Kreifel added to party Cole County Missouri (pty:dft))(Kreifel, Bretton)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer , #1 Notice of Removal, Cole County Missouri answer due 1/24/2022. Signed on 12/28/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Cole County Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/11/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heigele, Christopher)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cole County Missouri of Federal Court Removal pleadings to Cole County filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Defendant Cole County Missouri.(Heigele, Christopher)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County, case number 21AC-CC00441, filed by Christopher L. Heigele. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7727287. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cole County, Missouri Circuit Court Case File 21AC-CC00441, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Missouri Western)(Heigele, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oaker v. Skiles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Oaker
Represented By: William P. Nacy
Represented By: Scott T Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Couty
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Represented By: Jacob Donald Bielenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole County Missouri
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Represented By: Bretton William Hake Kreifel
Represented By: Jacob Donald Bielenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lloyd
Represented By: William C.J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?